Thomas Wooten v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Shashi H Kewalramani |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-02457 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1444 Notice of Removal - Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Dec 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 05, 2018 2:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Wooten
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 01/09 12:07 PM
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case12 Based upon the stipulation between the parties and their respective counsel, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (rfi) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 01/08 10:21 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Aleali, Mike) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 01/04 12:36 PM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for 2/15/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court not later than 2/1/2018. Court Reporter: None Present. (gk) |
|
10 | 10
10
pgs
order
Order
Thu 01/04 12:02 PM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. See document for details. (gk) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 12/11 9:13 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, re Notice of Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form,7 served on December 11, 2017. (Aleali, Mike) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 12/08 1:09 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form
Fri 12/08 1:08 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge George H. Wu. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:17-cv-2457-GW (SHKx). (ghap) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 12/07 6:00 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on 12/7/17. (Aleali, Mike) |
|
5 | 5
misc
For Judicial Notice
Thu 12/07 4:55 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Removal to Federal Court filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Aleali, Mike) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration B | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 12/07 4:54 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Ocwen Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Aleali, Mike) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 12/07 4:52 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, identifying Ocwen Financial Corporation. (Aleali, Mike) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 12/07 4:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Aleali, Mike) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 12/07 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number PSC1706173 Receipt No: 0973-20938531 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attorney Mike Aleali added to party Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft))(Aleali, Mike) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 12/08 12:55 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-100, Inclusive, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC., filed by plaintiff Thomas Wooten. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/6/2017 SUBMITTED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap) |