District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees et al v. SAMAP U.S.A CORP.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph C Spero |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-07021 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement |
Case Filed: | Dec 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 06, 2018 1:37 AM PDT |
3rd party defendant
First Republic Bank
|
|
3rd party defendant
Essequattro USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
3rd party plaintiff
SAMAP U.S.A CORP.
|
Represented By
|
Counter-claimant
Essequattro USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter-defendant
SAMAP U.S.A CORP.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SAMAP U.S.A CORP.
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Arthur R. Siegel
Law Offices of Arthur R. Siegel 351 California St. Suite 700
San Francisco, CA 94104 |
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Rigmaiden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred (Skip) Weltz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund; and its Joint Boards of Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Maggiore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
I.U.P.A.T. Union and Industry National Pension Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Christophersen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marian Bourboulis
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 13 2018
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Responses due by 7/20/2018. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 13, 2018. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018) |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |