Tomlin et al v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas W Thrash, Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-05009 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty |
Case Filed: | Dec 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 06, 2018 5:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marilyn Tomlin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael W. Tomlin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 08/01 2:24 PM
ORDER in case 1:17-cv-03422-TWT; denying as moot (1279) Motion for Extension of Time re (1279 in 1:17-md-02800-TWT) MOTION for Extension of Time in case 1:17-md-02800-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/01/2023. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(EQACtrk)(jkb) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Tue 08/01 2:41 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re (24 in 1:20-cv-00078-TWT) Order on Motion for Extension of Time. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(EQACtrk)(jkb) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion for TRO
Fri 06/16 3:52 PM
ORDER in case 1:17-cv-03422-TWT; denying (1271) Motion to Enforce Judgment; denying (1274) Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying (1274) Motion for TRO in case 1:17-md-02800-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 06/16/2023. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(EQACtrk)(jkb) |
|
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment
Fri 06/16 3:40 PM
ORDER in case 1:17-cv-03422-TWT; denying (1266) Motion to Enforce Judgment in case 1:17-md-02800-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 06/16/2023. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(EQACtrk)(jkb) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
14
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Relief
Wed 03/22 2:04 PM
OPINION AND ORDER in case 1:17-cv-03422-TWT; granting (1249) Motion for for Immediate Injunctive Relief to Prevent Evasion and Violation of this Court's Jurisdiction and Orders in case 1:17-md-02800-TWT. Sanford Heisler Sharp, and all those acting in concert with Sanford Heisler Sharp, are ENJOINED from proceeding with the action filed against Co-Lead Counsel in the Chancery Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, C/A No. 23-0169 I, and are ORDERED to dismiss that action with prejudice within five (5) days of the date of this Order. Should Sanford Heisler Sharp wish to pursue its claims against Co-Lead Counsel concerning the allocation of attorneys' fees, this Court has the exclusive jurisdiction to hear such a dispute. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/22/2023. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(EQACtrk)(jkb) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Clarification
Mon 08/10 8:51 AM
ORDER - This is an MDL proceeding arising out of the Equifax data breach. It is before the Court on the Motion for Clarification, or in the Alternative to Supplement the Record [Doc. 1134 ] of the Objectors Frank and Watkins. It is now obvious to the Court that the motivations of the Objectors in seeking to obtain the Proposed Order is to obstruct and delay resolution of the appeal while they challenge the findings in the final approval order that were personal to them. This litigation over the litigation is not in the best interests of the class or the efficient disposition of the appeal. Appellate Rule of Procedure 10(e) does not apply because the record truly discloses what occurred in the district court. The Motion for Clarification, or in the Alternative to Supplement the Record [Doc. 1134 ] of the Objectors Frank and Watkins is DENIED. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/7/2020. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(EQACtrk)(tcc) |
|
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Wed 04/08 10:51 AM
ORDER in case 1:17-cv-03422-TWT; denying as moot (805) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:17-md-02800-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/8/20. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(EQCCtrk)(TWT) |
|
Tuesday, March 17, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend
Tue 03/17 5:27 PM
ORDER GRANTING (969) Motion to Amend Order Granting Final Approval ofSettlement by Mikell Westin case 1:17-md-02800-TWT. An Amended Order will be filed. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/17/2020.(rvb) |
|
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend
Tue 03/17 5:25 PM
ORDER DENYING (978) Motion to Amend in case 1:17-md-02800-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/17/2020. (rvb) |
|
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 02/21 2:40 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING all the individual civil actions linked to this MDL action, EXCLUDING City of Chicago 1:18cv1470 and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico 1:18cv5611 vs. Equifax. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/20/2019. (Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.) (EQACtrk) (sap) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 02/21 4:38 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.) (EQACtrk) (sap) |
||
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/19 12:10 PM
NOTICE The Status Conference scheduled for Friday 7/20/2018 at 11:00 a.m. has been cancelled at request of counsel. A date for the next status conference will be determined and notice entered on docket for a date in late August or September. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(EQACtrk)(ss) |
||
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
16
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/23 2:24 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 3. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 3/20/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(EQACtrk)(ddm) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 01/12 11:15 AM
ORDER Scheduling Hearing on Applications for Leadership Appointments for 2/9/2018 at 10:00 a.m., Courtroom 2108. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/12/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(ss) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
19
pgs
order
Order
Wed 01/10 9:09 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/9/2018.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(ss) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1A Consumer Case and Counsel Table, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1B Small Business Cases and Counsel Table, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 Financial Cases and Counsel Table | ||
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Mon 12/11 4:27 PM
Courtroom Deputy's Certificate of E-Mailing re 23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 to all counsel on the attached list. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al (jkl) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT, 1:17-cv-03422-TWT, 1:17-cv-03433-TWT, 1:17-cv-03436-TWT, 1:17-cv-03443-TWT, 1:17-cv-03444-TWT, 1:17-cv-03445-TWT, 1:17-cv-03447-TWT, 1:17-cv-03448-TWT, 1:17-cv-03449-TWT, 1:17-cv-03450-TWT, 1:17-cv-03451-TWT, 1:17-cv-03452-TWT, 1:17-cv-03453-TWT, 1:17-cv-03454-TWT, 1:17-cv-03456-TWT, 1:17-cv-03457-TWT, 1:17-cv-03458-TWT, 1:17-cv-03459-TWT, 1:17-cv-03460-TWT, 1:17-cv-03461-TWT, 1:17-cv-03463-TWT, 1:17-cv-03476-TWT, 1:17-cv-03477-TWT, 1:17-cv-03479-TWT, 1:17-cv-03480-TWT, 1:17-cv-03482-TWT, 1:17-cv-03483-TWT, 1:17-cv-03484-TWT, 1:17-cv-03487-TWT, 1:17-cv-03492-TWT, 1:17-cv-03497-TWT, 1:17-cv-03498-TWT, 1:17-cv-03499-TWT, 1:17-cv-03501-TWT, 1:17-cv-03502-TWT, 1:17-cv-03507-TWT, 1:17-cv-03509-TWT, 1:17-cv-03512-TWT, 1:17-cv-03523-TWT, 1:17-cv-03571-TWT, 1:17-cv-03578-TWT, 1:17-cv-03582-TWT, 1:17-cv-03586-TWT, 1:17-cv-03587-TWT, 1:17-cv-03613-TWT, 1:17-cv-03618-TWT, 1:17-cv-03659-TWT, 1:17-cv-03676-TWT, 1:17-cv-03708-TWT, 1:17-cv-03713-TWT, 1:17-cv-03715-TWT, 1:17-cv-03745-TWT, 1:17-cv-03764-TWT, 1:17-cv-03765-TWT, 1:17-cv-03769-TWT, 1:17-cv-03798-TWT, 1:17-cv-03809-TWT, 1:17-cv-03829-TWT, 1:17-cv-03863-TWT, 1:17-cv-03872-TWT, 1:17-cv-03873-TWT, 1:17-cv-03881-TWT, 1:17-cv-03885-TWT, 1:17-cv-03886-TWT, 1:17-cv-03892-TWT, 1:17-cv-03905-TWT, 1:17-cv-03972-TWT, 1:17-cv-04159-TWT, 1:17-cv-04184-TWT, 1:17-cv-04250-TWT, 1:17-cv-04388-TWT, 1:17-cv-04389-TWT, 1:17-cv-04480-TWT, 1:17-cv-04544-TWT, 1:17-cv-04600-TWT, 1:17-cv-04694-TWT, 1:17-cv-04707-TWT, 1:17-cv-04756-TWT, 1:17-cv-04763-TWT, 1:17-cv-04775-TWT, 1:17-cv-04792-TWT, 1:17-cv-04822-TWT, 1:17-cv-04940-TWT, 1:17-cv-04942-TWT, 1:17-cv-04986-TWT, 1:17-cv-04987-TWT, 1:17-cv-04988-TWT, 1:17-cv-04989-TWT, 1:17-cv-04990-TWT, 1:17-cv-04996-TWT, 1:17-cv-04997-TWT, 1:17-cv-05001-TWT, 1:17-cv-05002-TWT, 1:17-cv-05003-TWT, 1:17-cv-05004-TWT, 1:17-cv-05005-TWT, 1:17-cv-05006-TWT, 1:17-cv-05007-TWT, 1:17-cv-05008-TWT, 1:17-cv-05009-TWT, 1:17-cv-05010-TWT, 1:17-cv-05014-TWT, 1:17-cv-05015-TWT, 1:17-cv-05016-TWT, 1:17-cv-05017-TWT, 1:17-cv-05020-TWT, 1:17-cv-05021-TWT, 1:17-cv-05022-TWT, 1:17-cv-05023-TWT, 1:17-cv-05024-TWT, 1:17-cv-05025-TWT, 1:17-cv-05026-TWT, 1:17-cv-05027-TWT, 1:17-cv-05028-TWT, 1:17-cv-05029-TWT, 1:17-cv-05037-TWT, 1:17-cv-05038-TWT, 1:17-cv-05039-TWT, 1:17-cv-05040-TWT, 1:17-cv-05041-TWT, 1:17-cv-05042-TWT, 1:17-cv-05048-TWT, 1:17-cv-05049-TWT, 1:17-cv-05050-TWT, 1:17-cv-05058-TWT, 1:17-cv-05059-TWT, 1:17-cv-05060-TWT, 1:17-cv-05061-TWT, 1:17-cv-05062-TWT, 1:17-cv-05063-TWT, 1:17-cv-05067-TWT, 1:17-cv-05068-TWT(jkl) |
|
Courtroom Deputy's Certificate of E-Mailing re 23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 to all counsel on the attached list. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(jkl) Modified on 12/11/2017 - pdf did not attach, refiled (jkl). | ||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Mon 12/11 2:47 PM
Courtroom Deputy's Certificate of E-Mailing re 23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 to all counsel on the attached list. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al (jkl) Modified on 12/11/2017 - pdf did not attach, refiled (jkl) |
||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Mon 12/11 2:39 PM
Courtroom Deputy's Certificate of E-Mailing re 23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 to all counsel on the attached list. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(jkl) Modified on 12/11/2017 - pdf did not attach, refiled (jkl) |
||
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 12/11 2:33 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Initial case management conference set for 1/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 12/8/17. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02800-TWT et al.(jkl) |
|
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 12/08 10:36 AM
Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-00158. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
9
pgs
misc
Order from Other Court
Fri 12/08 9:28 AM
CERTIFIED ORDER received from ND/GA re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO No. 550 filed in MDL Case Number 2800. (ECO)cc: COR [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 12/8/2017.] |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2800 (KRB) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 12/8/2017.] | |
Clerk's Note: Clerk deleted duplicate "Information Copy of MDL" docket entry at DE #9. (ECO) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 12/8/2017.] | ||
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER: The MOTION to Stay5 is GRANTED. All proceedings and deadlines in this case are stayed until the Judical Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the Motions for Consolidation and Transfer. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 11/8/2017.(ECO)cc: COR [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 12/8/2017.] | |
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 COPY of Plf's Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of Alabama and for Considerartion PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C §1407(ECO) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 12/8/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Envelope Post Marked 10-13-17 | ||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO John Williams re5 MOTION to Stay; Error: This motion requests 2 forms of relief and only one form of relief was selected; Entry by attorney; Clerk added the motion relief requested. In the future, when filing a motion with multiple reliefs, select a motion relief for each relief requested, so all motions will appear on the Judges motion report. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (ECO) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 12/8/2017.] | ||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of District Judge William O. Bertelsman for review: re5 MOTION to Stay by Equifax Information Services, LLC (KRB) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 12/8/2017.] | ||
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 MOTION to Stay or in the alternative, for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC .(Williams, John). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and modified text to take out referral language on 10/10/2017 (ECO). [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 12/8/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
Clerk's Note: re1 Complaint. Email with copy of complaint and docket sheet sent to MDL regarding possible tag along case w/MDL 2800. (TJZ) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 12/8/2017.] | ||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
Conflict Check run. (KRB) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 12/8/2017.] | ||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KRB) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 12/8/2017.] | |
3 | 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Mag. Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Case to revert back to undersigned to hold final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge to conduct all pretrial/status conferences and rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine to be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial also to be before the undersigned. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 06/18/2010.(KRB)cc: COR [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 12/8/2017.] | |
1 | 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-3890371), filed by Michael W. Tomlin, Marilyn Tomlin.(KRB) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 12/8/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Equifax |