Frazier v. Ryan et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Steven P Logan |
Referred: | John Z Boyle |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-04546 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Dec 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2018 |
Petitioner
James Kevin Frazier
|
|
Respondent
Attorney General of the State of Arizona
|
|
Respondent
Charles L Ryan
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
appeal
USCA Order
Fri 12/21 4:10 PM
ORDER of USCA 18-16779 denying the request for certificate of appealability re:17 Notice of Appeal filed by James Kevin Frazier. (LAD) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Change of Address (Party)
Tue 10/23 12:24 PM
NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by James Kevin Frazier: 1117 N Granite, Gilbert, AZ 85234. (1 page) (REK) |
|
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 10/03 3:59 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to James Kevin Frazier. Reason for return: Return to Sender: No Longer in Custody. Document number 17. (REK) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 09/19 3:42 PM
USCA Case Number re:17 Notice of Appeal; Ninth Circuit Case number 18-16779 (copies sent by the Ninth Circuit) (ATD) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Tue 09/18 2:38 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James Kevin Frazier (8 pages). (DXD) |
|
17 | 17
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 09/18 2:36 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re:15 Order,16 Clerks Judgment by James Kevin Frazier (18 pages). NOTE: Order15 denied certificate of appealability and leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal.(DXD) |
|
Att: 1 Application for COA, | ||
Att: 2 Motion to Appeal IFP | ||
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Clerks Judgment
Mon 08/20 4:17 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED adopting the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge as the order of this Court. Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U. S. C. § 2254 is denied and this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. (GMP) |
|
15 | 15
3
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendation
Mon 08/20 4:13 PM
ORDER - That the11 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation is accepted and adopted by the Court; That the Petitioner's12 Objections are overruled; That the1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and3 Supplement are denied and this action is dismissed with prejudice; That a Certificate of Appealability and leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal are denied because the dismissal of the Petition is justified by a plain procedural bar and reasonable jurists would not find the ruling debatable; and that the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/20/18. (GMP) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 08/17 5:04 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 Response by James Kevin Frazier. (2 pages) (GMP) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Response
Wed 08/08 9:23 AM
RESPONSE re:12 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Respondents Attorney General of the State of Arizona, Charles L Ryan. (Knobloch, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Wed 08/01 4:42 PM
OBJECTION to11 Report and Recommendation filed by James Kevin Frazier. (10 pages) (REK) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Report and Recommendation
Mon 07/16 1:42 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2244 (doc.1 ) be DENIED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. This recommendation is not an order that is immediately appealable to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (See document for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 7/16/18. (SLQ) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
respoth
Reply to Response to Habeas Petition (State/2254)
Tue 04/17 8:41 AM
REPLY TO RESPONSE to9 Habeas Petition (State/2254) filed by James Kevin Frazier. (69 pages) (EJA) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Response to Habeas Petition (State/2254)
Tue 03/20 2:15 PM
Limited RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) by Attorney General of the State of Arizona, Charles L Ryan.(Knobloch, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit HCR Exhibit A - F, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit HCR Exhibit G - U, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit HCR Exhibit V - GG | ||
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 01/19 1:07 PM
ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus7 is granted. Respondents shall have up to, and including, March 22, 2018 to file their response. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 1/19/2018. (REK) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 01/19 9:34 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) by Charles L Ryan.(Knobloch, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Tue 01/09 11:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Karl Knobloch on behalf of Charles L Ryan. (Knobloch, Eric) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Notice of Receipt of E-Service by AZ AG
Thu 12/28 2:03 PM
Notice of Receipt of Electronic Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Arizona Attorney General on 12/27/17. The Attorney General's Office will file a Notice of Appearance within five (5) business days that identifies the respondents that are represented or, in the alternative, will notify the Court if the Attorney General is not able to accept service for and/or represent any of the named respondents. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Sparks, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
AZ AG Service Order (2254)
Wed 12/27 9:56 AM
ORDER: The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the Petition1 and this Order on the Respondent(s) and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona by electronic mail. Respondents must answer the Petition within 40 days of the date of service. Petitioner may file a reply within 30 days from the date of service of the answer. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge John Z. Boyle pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 12/22/2017. (REK) |
|
Att: 1 2254 Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Supplement
Thu 12/21 9:05 AM
SUPPLEMENT re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) by Petitioner James Kevin Frazier. (3 pages) (REK) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment
Fri 12/08 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (REK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254)
Fri 12/08 11:01 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254). Filing fee received: $5.00, receipt number PHX191813 filed by James Kevin Frazier. (58 pages) (REK) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |