Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America v. M.V. Bremen Express et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edgardo Ramos |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-09711 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333ad Admiralty |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 19, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 09, 2018 6:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Hapag-Lloyd AG
399 Hoes Lane
Piscataway, NJ 08854 |
|
Defendant
Orient Overseas Container Line Limited
in personam 88 Pine Street 17th Floor
New York, NY 10005 |
Represented By
|
Defendant-in-Rem
M.V. Bremen Express
|
|
Plaintiff
Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America
560 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 09/19 11:47 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Hapag-Lloyd AG, M.V. Bremen Express, Orient Overseas Container Line Limited and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). .(Heilig, Justin) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 03/29 11:27 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Hapag-Lloyd AG waiver sent on 2/1/2018, answer due 5/2/2018. Document filed by Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America. (Heilig, Justin) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 01/12 3:27 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Orient Overseas (International) Ltd. for Orient Overseas Container Line Limited. Document filed by Orient Overseas Container Line Limited.(Daly, Kathryn) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/12 3:24 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Orient Overseas Container Line Limited.(Daly, Kathryn) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/12 3:19 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn Blythe Daly on behalf of Orient Overseas Container Line Limited. (Daly, Kathryn) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/12 3:18 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Rocco Nolan on behalf of Orient Overseas Container Line Limited. (Nolan, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 12/14 5:40 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Orient Overseas Container Line Limited waiver sent on 12/14/2017, answer due 2/12/2018. Document filed by Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America. (Heilig, Justin) |
|
utility
Case Accepted as Related
Thu 12/14 10:31 AM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-06059-ER. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Thu 12/14 10:36 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 12/14 10:37 AM
Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (ma) |
||
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/13 1:43 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Orient Overseas Container Line Limited. (pc) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/13 1:43 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hapag-Lloyd AG. (pc) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Tue 12/12 12:51 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Justin Matthew Heilig. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Orient Overseas Container Line Limited, M.V. Bremen Express. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pc) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 12/12 12:57 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 12/12 12:57 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Tue 12/12 12:58 PM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Edgardo Ramos as possibly related to 17cv6059 (pc) |
||
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 12/11 4:21 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Orient Overseas Container Line Limited d/b/a OOCL, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America. (Heilig, Justin) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 12/11 4:20 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hapag-Lloyd AG, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America. (Heilig, Justin) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Statement of Relatedness
Mon 12/11 4:14 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-06059 (ER). Document filed by Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America.(Heilig, Justin) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 12/11 4:08 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent MS & AD Group Holdings, Inc. for Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America. Document filed by Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America.(Heilig, Justin) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 12/11 4:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Heilig, Justin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/11 4:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Hapag-Lloyd AG, M.V. Bremen Express, Orient Overseas Container Line Limited. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14461471)Document filed by Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America.(Heilig, Justin) |