DENOCHICK v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael A Shipp |
Referred: | Rukhsanah L Singh |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-12874 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 09, 2018 6:19 AM EDT |
Defendant
IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC")
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC")
|
Represented By
|
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
|
|
Plaintiff
NICHOLE DENOCHICK
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Substitution of Attorney
Mon 04/01 2:49 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney THOMAS T. LOCKE terminated. Attorney SUZANNE I. TURPIN for PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (PCPC) added.. (TURPIN, SUZANNE) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Wed 12/13 2:40 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw and for Substitution of Counsel is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk is hereby directed to TERMINATE the Motion pending at Docket Entry No.12 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 12/12/2023. (jdg) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2023 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 12/05 11:04 AM
Set Deadlines as to (11 in 3:17-cv-11035-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-11041-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-11047-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-11055-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-11069-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-11071-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-11211-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-11212-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (10 in 3:17-cv-11475-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-12539-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-12549-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-12567-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (13 in 3:17-cv-12575-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (10 in 3:17-cv-12690-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (13 in 3:17-cv-12831-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (11 in 3:17-cv-12835-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney , (12 in 3:17-cv-12874-MAS-RLS) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney . Motion set for 1/2/2024 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh) |
||
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Withdraw as Attorney Substitute Attorney
Mon 12/04 5:38 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , MOTION to Substitute Attorney by NICHOLE DENOCHICK.(SIMON, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 21, 2023 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 02/21 11:13 AM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman and Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson no longer assigned to case. (mg, ) |
||
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/20 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. SILVER on behalf of IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC") (SILVER, MARK) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
30+
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/12 9:51 AM
ORDER that each of the Pre-CMO Cases identified in Exhibit A are DISMISSED, without prejudice, as to Defendant PCPC only. In the event a dismissal is inadvertently entered in a case not subject to dismissal for the reasons stated above, this will constitute grounds for the effected plaintiff to reinstate his or her action against PCPC, and the statute of limitations in such a case would be tolled from the date of the entry of dismissal until the date of reinstatement. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/11/2018.(mmh) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/10 10:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by GENE M. WILLIAMS on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. (WILLIAMS, GENE) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/09 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/09 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by LORNA A. DOTRO on behalf of IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC") (DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/09 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. (TERSIGNI, JULIE) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/09 9:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 01/08 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/22 9:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS T. LOCKE on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC") (LOCKE, THOMAS) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 12/12 10:24 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC"), JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC") Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Melissa M. Haneke* (mmh) |
|
mdl
MDL Direct File
Tue 12/12 10:23 AM
Member Case Direct File on 12/11/2017, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (mmh) |
||
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/11 10:38 AM
COMPLAINT against IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC"), JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC") ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8318993) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NICHOLE DENOCHICK.(ASKEW, BENJAMIN) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 12/11 3:24 PM
Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (ces,) |