Bankmanagers Corporation, et al v. Federal Insurance Company, et al
Original Case: 2:11-cv-00871
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:13-cv-01506 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2013 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2013 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 11, 2016 1:44 PM CST |
Defendant
KOSS CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
BANKMANAGERS CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
PARK BANK
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/11/2016 12:31 PM CST |
Thursday, March 07, 2013 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Transcript information sheet due by 03/21/2013. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Bankmanagers Corporation and Park Bank by 03/14/2013. Fee or IFP forms due on 03/21/2013 for Appellants Bankmanagers Corporation and Park Bank. [1] [6469476] 13-1506 (AD) | |
2 | 2 Filed notice from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee was received. [2] [6469632] 13-1506 (EF) | |
3 | 3 ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/08/2013 for Bankmanagers Corporation and Park Bank. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/06/2013 for Federal Insurance Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/20/2013 for Appellants Bankmanagers Corporation and Park Bank. [3] [6469636] 13-1506 (EF) |