Gladstone v. Globex Transfer, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-07986
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-07986
California Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christopher B Latham |
Case #: | 3:17-ap-90211 |
Nature of Suit | 1 null 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 17, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Globex Transfer, LLC, a Florida limited liability company
780 Deltona Blvd., Suite 202
Deltona, FL 32725 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiffs
Leslie T. Gladstone, Chapter 7 Trustee
401 Via Del Norte
La Jolla, CA 92037 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
order
Closed Adversary Proceeding
Tue 12/17 2:29 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Slaughter, S.) |
|
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Request/Notice)
Fri 10/25 12:59 PM
Notice Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding 3:17-ap-90211. filed by Christin A. Batt of Financial Law Group on behalf of Leslie T. Gladstone. (Batt, Christin) |
|
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
notice
BNC Court Certificate of Notice
Sun 12/09 9:19 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Notice Date 12/09/2018. (Admin.) |
|
29 | 29
order
Virtual Minute Order (paperless entry) - manual entry
Fri 12/07 5:23 PM
Virtual Entry. Termination of Hearing DATE: 12/10/2018. MATTER: PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (fr. 10/15/18). DISPOSITION: Matter off calendar. Order on Approval of Stipulation to Settle Adversary Proceeding w/Globex Transfer LLC entered 12/7/18 . (McGrew, J.) |
|
28 | 28
order
Intended Action (Order) (CSD 1180 & 2062)
Fri 12/07 5:21 PM
Order on Approval of Stipulation to Settle Adversary Proceeding w/Globex Transfer LLC (AP 17-90211 CL) signed on 12/7/2018; with BNC Service.. (McGrew, J.) |
|
Wednesday, December 05, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Report
Wed 12/05 9:27 AM
Trustee's Status Report with proof of service attached, filed by Christin A. Batt on behalf of Leslie T. Gladstone. (Batt, Christin) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Minute Order - manual entry
Wed 10/17 5:50 PM
Minute Order. Hearing DATE: 10/15/2018. MATTER: PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (fr. 8/6/18). DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE Scheduled for 12/10/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse. (McGrew, J.) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
notice
BNC Court Certificate of Notice
Thu 08/09 9:17 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Notice Date 08/09/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Minute Order - manual entry
Tue 08/07 2:45 PM
Minute Order. Hearing DATE: 08/06/2018. MATTER: PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (fr. 5/21/18). DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE Scheduled for 10/15/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse. (McGrew, J.) |
|
23 | 23
order
Stipulated Order
Mon 08/06 5:58 PM
Order On Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline ; with BNC Service signed on 8/6/2018. (Slaughter, S.) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation
Fri 08/03 12:24 PM
Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline, filed by Christin A. Batt on behalf of Leslie T. Gladstone. (Batt, Christin) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Minute Order - manual entry
Thu 05/24 4:32 PM
Minute Order. Hearing DATE: 05/21/2018. MATTER: PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (fr. 4/9/18). DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE Scheduled for 8/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse. (McGrew, J.). Modified on 5/24/2018 (McGrew, J.) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
BNC Court Certificate of Notice
Fri 04/13 9:21 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Notice Date 04/13/2018. (Admin.) |
|
19 | 19
order
Schedule/Continue Hearing (Order)
Wed 04/11 2:06 PM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order; with Service by BNC PRETRIAL scheduled for 5/21/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse ; signed on 4/11/2018. (Paluso, R.) Modified on 4/11/2018 (Paluso, R.) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Minute Order - manual entry
Wed 04/11 11:29 AM
Minute Order. Hearing DATE: 04/09/2018. MATTER: PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE . DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE Scheduled for 5/21/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse. (McGrew, J.) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Compliance with Early Conference of Counsel, LBR 7016-1 (CSD 3018)
Thu 03/22 12:01 PM
Certificate of Compliance with Early Conference of Counsel, LBR 7016-1 , with proof of service attached, filed by Christin A. Batt of Financial Law Group on behalf of Leslie T. Gladstone. (Batt, Christin) |
|
Monday, February 19, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
BNC Court Certificate of Notice
Thu 02/22 9:24 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Notice Date 02/22/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
BNC Court Certificate of Notice
Sun 02/18 9:17 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Notice Date 02/18/2018. (Admin.) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Hearing, Pre-Trial Status Conference (Notice) (CSD 3019)(BNC)
Fri 02/16 6:17 PM
Notice of Pre-Trial Status Conference -- PRE-TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE Scheduled for 4/9/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 5, Room 318, Weinberger Courthouse . (McGrew, J.) |
|
13 | 13
order
Pro Hac Vice Application and Order Thereon (CSD 3005)
Fri 02/16 2:07 PM
Pro Hac Vice Application and Order Thereon; with BNC Service signed on 2/16/2018. Receipt Number 98420, Fee Amount 206.00 (Paluso, R.) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
ans
Answer to Complaint - ans
Fri 02/16 8:51 AM
Defendant's Original Answer filed by Globex Transfer, LLC. (Paluso, R.) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
BNC Court Certificate of Notice
Thu 02/15 9:21 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Notice Date 02/15/2018. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
court
Errors/Deficiencies (BNC)
Tue 02/13 2:52 PM
Notice to Filer of Errors and/or Deficiencies in Documents. (Bobis, T.) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 02/13 2:52 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Globex Transfer, LLC . (Bobis, T.) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
BNC Court Certificate of Notice
Wed 01/31 9:21 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Notice Date 01/31/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Stipulated Order
Mon 01/29 5:38 AM
Order RegardingStipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint; with BNC Service signed on 1/26/2018. (Paluso, R.) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Thu 01/25 4:27 PM
Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, with proof of service attached, filed by Christin A. Batt on behalf of Leslie T. Gladstone. (Batt, Christin) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Return of Summons Served
Fri 12/15 4:09 PM
Summons Served on: Globex Transfer, LLC and also agent for service of process: Michael J. Turner III. Served On 12/15/2017 filed by Christin A. Batt on behalf of Leslie T. Gladstone. (Batt, Christin) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Compliance with Early Conference of Counsel, LBR 7016-1 (CSD 3018)
Fri 12/15 4:08 PM
Notice of Early Conference of Counsel pursuant to LBR 7016-2 with Certificate of Compliance with Early Conference of Counsel, LBR 7016-1 , attached; filed by Christin A. Batt of Financial Law Group on behalf of Leslie T. Gladstone. (Batt, Christin) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-docket of credit card
Thu 12/14 3:13 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 17-90211 CL] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Fee Amount 350.00 Receipt number A13684230 ; (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (CSD 2500A) (auto)
Thu 12/14 11:04 AM
Summons Issued on Globex Transfer, LLC Answer Due 01/16/2018; with Certificate of Service. (Admin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Thu 12/14 11:04 AM
Adversary case 17-90211 Complaint by Leslie T. Gladstone against Globex Transfer, LLC. Nature of Suit: 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause) 13 14 , Fee Amount $ 350.00 Filed by Christin A. Batt on behalf of Leslie T. Gladstone. (Batt, Christin) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |