The Sports Zone, Inc. and The Zone 400, LLC
Maryland Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Thomas J Catliota |
Case #: | 0:17-bk-26758 |
Case Filed: | Dec 15, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 10, 2018 |
Claims Deadline: | Apr 23, 2018 |
Converted: | May 22, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 17, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
The Sports Zone, Inc.
5851 Ammendale Rd
Beltsville, MD 20705-1264 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
The Zone 220, LLC
5851 Ammendale Road
Beltsville, MD 20705 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Sports Zone of Hechinger, LLC
5851 Ammendale Road
Beltsville, MD 20705 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
The Zone 450, LLC
5851 Ammendale Road
Beltsville, MD 20705 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
The Zone 600, LLC
5851 Ammendale Road
Beltsville, MD 20705 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
The Zone 620, LLC
5851 Ammendale Road
Beltsville, MD 20705 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Zone of DC USA, LLC
5851 Ammendale Road
Beltsville, MD 20705 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
The Zone 700 L.L.C.
5851 Ammendale Road
Beltsville, MD 20705 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
The Zone 870 L.L.C.
5851 Ammendale Road
Beltsville, MD 20705 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
The Zone 999 L.L.C.
5851 Ammendale Road
Beltsville, MD 20705 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
The Zone 400, LLC
5851 Ammendale Road
Beltsville, MD 20705 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Michael G. Wolff
Wolff & Orenstein, LLC Shady Grove Plaza, North Lobby 15245 Shady Grove Road, Suite 465
Rockville, MD 20850 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee - Greenbelt
6305 Ivy Lane, Suite 600
Greenbelt, MD 20770 |
Represented By
|
1. | The Sports Zone files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (footwearnews.com) |
Submitted Tue 12/19/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 10/21/2020 10:38 AM EDT |
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
court
Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Fri 12/15 10:23 AM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) |
||
1 | 1
33
pgs
misc
VOLUNTARY Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 12/15 10:20 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by The Sports Zone, Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan Exclusivity expires 04/16/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 06/13/2018. Schedule B due 12/29/2017. Schedule A/B due 12/29/2017. Schedule D due 12/29/2017. Schedule F due 12/29/2017. Schedule E/F due 12/29/2017. Schedule G due 12/29/2017. Schedule H due 12/29/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 12/29/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 12/29/2017. Incomplete Filings due 12/29/2017 (Nesse, Janet) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 12/15 10:23 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-26758 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 31827559. Fee amount 1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
misc
Support Document
Fri 12/15 10:27 AM
Support Document (Corporate Resolution) Filed by Janet M. Nesse . (Nesse, Janet) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Use Cash Collateral
Fri 12/15 10:50 AM
Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by The Sports Zone, Inc.. (Fasano, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
motion
Pay Pre-Petition Wages
Fri 12/15 10:51 AM
Emergency Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Wages Filed by The Sports Zone, Inc.. (Fasano, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
motion
Limit Notice
Fri 12/15 10:52 AM
Emergency Motion to Limit Notice Filed by The Sports Zone, Inc.. (Fasano, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
Continuation of Utility Service
Fri 12/15 10:55 AM
Emergency Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Filed by The Sports Zone, Inc.. (Fasano, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 12/15 11:01 AM
Emergency Motion for an Order Authorizing (I) the Continued Use of: (A) the Debtors Cash Management System, and (B) Bank Accounts and Business Forms; and (II) Banks to Honor Certain Transfers, and Charge Certain Fees and Other Amounts Filed by The Sports Zone, Inc.. (Fasano, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
7
pgs
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 12/15 11:02 AM
Emergency Motion of Debtor for Entry of an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 363, and 541(d) and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6003 and 6004(H) Authorizing the Debtor to Enter Into and Perform under Consignment Arrangements Filed by The Sports Zone, Inc.. (Fasano, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
motion
Assume/Reject Leases or Executory Contracts
Fri 12/15 11:05 AM
Omnibus Motion to Reject Leases or Executory Contracts Filed by The Sports Zone, Inc.. (Fasano, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
motion
Expedite Hearing
Fri 12/15 11:08 AM
Emergency Motion to Expedite Hearing on First Day Motions and, Motion to Shorten Time to Object to First Day Motions Filed by The Sports Zone, Inc. . (Fasano, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Fri 12/15 11:09 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Janet M. Nesse. (Nesse, Janet) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Line
Fri 12/15 12:59 PM
Line Submitting Amended 30-day Budget in Support of Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors Use of Cash Collateral. on behalf of The Sports Zone, Inc. Filed by Justin Philip Fasano . (Fasano, Justin) |
|
15 | 15
order
Setting Hearing (bk)
Fri 12/15 1:24 PM
Order Granting11 Motion to Expedite Hearing On And Shorten Time To Object To First Day Motions . Hearing scheduled for 12/20/2017 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3-E, Greenbelt - Judge Catliota. (Smith, Denise) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 12/15 2:00 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by US Trustee - Greenbelt. (Kohen, Lynn) |
|
17 | 17
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/15 5:39 PM
Adversary case 17-00496 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Justin Philip Fasano on behalf of The Sports Zone, Inc. against Nike USA, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. (Fasano, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Note | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Security Agreement | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Note Amendment | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Maryland UCC notice | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Virginia UCC Filing | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 12/15 5:47 PM
Omnibus Certificate of Service Regarding First Day Motions Filed by Justin Philip Fasano . (Fasano, Justin) |