KASPERSKY LAB, INC. et al v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen Kollar-Kotelly |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02697 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 16, 2018 4:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KASPERSKY LAB, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KASPERSKY LABS LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 30 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION Regarding 25 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 21 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/30/2018. (lcckk3) |
1. | Judge Dismisses Kaspersky Suit Challenging Software Ban (wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 05/31/2018 | |
2. | Kaspersky Sues U.S. Over Order to Remove Its Anti-Virus Software (wsj.com) |
Submitted Tue 12/19/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 01/28 5:42 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to (15 in 1:18-cv-00325-CKK) Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by KASPERSKY LABS LIMITED, KASPERSKY LAB, INC., (27 in 1:17-cv-02697-CKK) Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by KASPERSKY LABS LIMITED, KASPERSKY LAB, INC. ; USCA Case Number 18-5176 Consolidated with 18-5177 (zrdj) |
|
Att: 1 USCA Judgment | ||
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Leave to File Denied
Mon 10/22 4:45 PM
LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Justin Credico's Motion to Intervene "Leave to file Denied. Case closed, on Appeal." This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/18/18. (ztd) |
|
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Transcript
Fri 06/22 4:43 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, held on 02/16/2018. Page Numbers: 1-17. Date of Issuance: 06/22/2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sara A. Wick, Telephone number 202-354-3284. Tape Number: N/A. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or p urchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/20/2018.(Wick, Sara) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Transcript
Wed 06/20 4:54 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IN CHAMBERS before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on 1-22-18; Page Numbers: 1 through 26; Date of Issuance: 6-20-18; Court Reporter: Timothy R. Milller, Telephone number (202) 354-3111, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the cou rt reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/18/2018.(Miller, Timothy) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Fri 06/08 3:41 PM
USCA Case Number 18-5176 for27 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by KASPERSKY LABS LIMITED, KASPERSKY LAB, INC. (zrdj) |
||
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Thu 06/07 11:49 AM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date 06/06/2018 re27 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (ztd) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Wed 06/06 5:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to26 Memorandum & Opinion,25 Order on Motion to Dismiss by KASPERSKY LAB, INC., KASPERSKY LABS LIMITED. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5520747. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Fayhee, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
55
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 05/30 1:19 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION Regarding25 ORDER GRANTING Defendants'21 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/30/2018. (lcckk3) |
|
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 05/30 1:16 PM
ORDER GRANTING Defendants'21 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/30/2018. (lcckk3) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Mon 04/16 10:21 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re21 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN. (Singer, Sam) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Mon 04/09 10:53 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re21 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss filed by KASPERSKY LAB, INC., KASPERSKY LABS LIMITED.(Chasin, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
22 | 22
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Mon 04/09 10:51 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by KASPERSKY LAB, INC., KASPERSKY LABS LIMITED. (Chasin, Steven) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 03/26 10:52 PM
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN(Singer, Sam) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Samuel Singer, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Combined Exhibits for Singer Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Appendix Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit A to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit B to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit C to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit D to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit E to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit F to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit G to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit H to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit I to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit J to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit K to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit L to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit M to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit N to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit P to Index to AR Excerpts | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response to motion
Mon 03/26 10:42 PM
RESPONSE re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN.(Singer, Sam) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Samuel Singer, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Combined Exhibits to Singer Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit E to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit F to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit G to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit H to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit I to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit J to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit K to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit L to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit M to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit N to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit O to Index to AR Excerpts, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit P to Index to AR Excerpts | ||
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 02/22 11:37 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by KASPERSKY LAB, INC., KASPERSKY LABS LIMITED(Chasin, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Angelo Gentile in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Ryan P. Fayhee in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A-E to Declaration of Ryan P. Fayhee, | ||
Att: 6 Appendix Index to Administrative Record Excerpts, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit A-D of Administrative Record Excerpts, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit E of Administrative Record Excerpt, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit F-H of Administrative Record Excerpts, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I-O of Administrative Record Excerpts | ||
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 02/20 12:28 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's administrative record due by 4/16/2018. Cross Motion due by 3/26/2018. Response to Cross Motion due by 4/9/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 4/16/2018. Summary Judgment motion due by 2/22/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/26/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/9/2018. (tb) |
||
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
.Order
Fri 02/16 4:18 PM
SCHEDULING AND PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/16/2018. (lcckk3) |
|
17 | 17
order
.Order
Fri 02/16 4:01 PM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING Kaspersky Lab, Inc., et al., v. United States Department of Homeland Security, et al., (17-cv-2697) and Kaspersky Lab, Inc., et al., v. United States of America (18-cv-325) for the purpose of briefing an upcoming round of dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/16/2018. (lcckk3) |
|
order
.Order
Fri 02/16 3:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs'16 Notice of Withdrawal of Application for Preliminary Injunction in Favor of Expedited Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. In light of Plaintiffs' Notice, Plaintiffs'10 Application for Preliminary Injunction is WITHDRAWN. Defendants' February 22, 2018 deadline to file a sur-reply with respect to that motion is VACATED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/16/2018. (lcckk3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 02/20 12:36 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference on the record set for 2/16/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot) |
||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 02/20 12:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Telephone Conference on the record held on 2/16/2018. (Court Reporter Sara Wick.) (dot) |
||
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
Thu 02/15 3:08 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by KASPERSKY LAB, INC., KASPERSKY LABS LIMITED re10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , in Favor of Expedited Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule (Chasin, Steven) |
|
order
.Order
Thu 02/15 5:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's16 Notice of Withdrawal of Application for Preliminary Injunction in Favor of Expedited Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. The Court will hold a teleconference with the parties on the record to discuss scheduling on FEBRUARY 16, 2018 at 12:00 PM. The parties shall call chambers jointly, on a single line. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/15/2018. (lcckk3) |
||
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 02/13 10:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs'15 Reply in Support of Application for Preliminary Injunction. Simultaneously with filing their Reply, Plaintiffs have filed a new lawsuit challenging the NDAA as a Bill of Attainder (Kaspersky Lab, Inc., et al, v. United States, 18-cv-325), the existence of which they rely on in their Reply. By no later than FEBRUARY 22, 2018, the Government shall file a Sur-Reply addressing Plaintiffs' arguments relating to this new case (e.g., Plaintiffs' arguments regarding standing, as well as any other arguments the Government deems appropriate to respond to). Other than this filing, no further briefing on Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Application is allowed. Plaintiffs' decision to file a new lawsuit on the same date that they filed their Reply means that the Court's resolution of Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Application will necessarily be delayed. Especially now that this new issue has been injected into this case, the Court reiterates its strong view that a preliminary injunction motion is not the most appropriate vehicle for an expeditious resolution of Plaintiffs' claims on their merits. The Court will give Plaintiffs an opportunity, by no later than FEBRUARY 15, 2018, to notify the Court if they have decided to withdraw their preliminary injunction application and instead pursue an expedited summary judgment briefing schedule. Such an approach would allow the parties to receive a final decision on the merits of Plaintiffs' claims and Defendants' jurisdictional arguments far faster than if the Court first considers Plaintiff's preliminary injunction application, then potentially considers a motion to dismiss which Defendants have indicated they intend to file, and only then sets a briefing schedule for cross-summary judgment motions. If Plaintiffs do not file anything by February 15th, the Court will proceed on the current schedule. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/13/2018. (lcckk3) |
||
notice
Notice of QC
Tue 02/13 3:33 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re15 Reply to opposition to Motion; emailed to steven.chasin@bakermckenzie.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Do not refile. For future reference, please review LCvR 5.4(b)(4). The person who is signing the document must be the person electronically filing. (ztd, ) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 02/14 12:45 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's Sur-Reply addressing Plaintiffs' arguments relating to this new case due by 2/22/2018. (dot) |
||
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Mon 02/12 11:38 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by KASPERSKY LAB, INC., KASPERSKY LABS LIMITED. (Chasin, Steven) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Thu 02/08 9:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants'14 Consent Motion for a Stay of Response Deadline. Defendants request a stay of their deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint pending the resolution of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants argue that filing a response at this time would complicate this matter, and that the Court's ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction will likely inform whatever response Defendants intend to file. Plaintiffs consent to Defendants' motion. Defendants' motion is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is STAYED pending further Court Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/8/2018. (lcckk3) |
||
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 02/07 11:20 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, pending resolution of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN(Singer, Sam) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response to motion
Mon 02/05 8:25 PM
RESPONSE re10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN.(Singer, Sam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Grant Schneider | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/05 7:44 PM
NOTICE of Lodging Administrative Record by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN(Singer, Sam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration and Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit AR Part 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit AR Part 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit AR Part 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit AR Part 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit AR Part 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit AR Part 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit AR Part 7 | ||
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Errata
Tue 01/23 12:20 PM
ERRATA Regarding Final Page of Declaration of Angelo Gentile in Support of Plaintiffs' Application for Preliminary Injunction by KASPERSKY LAB, INC., KASPERSKY LABS LIMITED10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by KASPERSKY LABS LIMITED, KASPERSKY LAB, INC..(Chasin, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Angelo Gentile - Final Page | ||
order
.Order
Tue 01/23 8:57 AM
MINUTE ORDER. On January 22, 2018, the Court held a teleconference on the record in this matter regarding Plaintiff's10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. As agreed during that teleconference, Defendant shall file the administrative record and an opposition to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction by no later than FEBRUARY 5, 2018. That opposition may incorporate a motion to dismiss the complaint. Plaintiff shall file a reply by no later than FEBRUARY 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/23/2018. (lcckk3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 01/23 4:22 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Administrative Record due by 2/5/2018. Motion to dismiss due by 2/5/2018. Response to10 due by 2/5/2018. Plaintiff's Reply due by 2/12/2018. (dot) |
||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 01/23 3:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Telephone Conference held on 1/22/2018. (Court Reporter Timothy Miller.) (dot) |
||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
order
.Order
Thu 01/18 10:17 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court will hold a teleconference with the parties on the record to establish a schedule for moving forward in this case on JANUARY 22, 2018 at 10:00 AM. The parties shall jointly, on a single line, call chambers at the telephone number that has been provided by e-mail. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/18/2018. (lcckk3) |
||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 01/18 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference on the record set for 1/22/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot) |
||
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Wed 01/17 11:45 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by KASPERSKY LAB, INC., KASPERSKY LABS LIMITED(Chasin, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Angelo Gentile, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Ryan P Fayhee, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A (Fayhee Declaration), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B (Fayhee Declaration), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C (Fayhee Declaration), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D (Fayhee Declaration), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit E (Fayhee Declaration), | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit F (Fayhee Declaration), | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit G (Fayhee Declaration), | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit H (Fayhee Declaration), | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit I (Fayhee Declaration), | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit J (Fayhee Declaration), | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit K (Fayhee Declaration), | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit L (Fayhee Declaration), | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit M (Fayhee Declaration), | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit N (Fayhee Declaration), | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit O (Fayhee Declaration), | ||
Att: 19 Notice of Request for Expedited Hearing and Statement of Facts Making Expedition Essential, | ||
Att: 20 Text of Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Wed 01/17 7:33 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN served on 12/26/2017 (Chasin, Steven) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Wed 01/17 7:32 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 12/26/2017 (Chasin, Steven) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Wed 01/17 1:38 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/26/2017. (Chasin, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/16 8:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sam M. Singer on behalf of All Defendants (Singer, Sam) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Wed 12/20 4:16 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/20/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/18/2018. (Chasin, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Wed 12/20 8:34 AM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(sth) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
.Order
Tue 12/19 2:32 PM
ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/19/17. (DM) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Mon 12/18 1:03 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by KASPERSKY LAB, INC., KASPERSKY LABS LIMITED (Chasin, Steven) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/18 12:18 PM
COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5252580) filed by KASPERSKY LAB, INC., KASPERSKY LABS LIMITED.(Chasin, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Department of Homeland Security, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Kirstjen Nielsen, Secretary of DHS, | ||
Att: 4 Summons US Attorney General, | ||
Att: 5 Summons US Attorney for the District of Columbia | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 12/19 12:35 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsth) |