Chamberlin Grim v. Baker, et al
Original Case: 7:11-cv-06197
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:13-cv-01189 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Case Filed: | Mar 29, 2013 |
Terminated: | Feb 03, 2014 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 11, 2016 11:47 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Ellen L. Baker
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Burke Chamberlin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
William J. Chamberlin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Scott Chamberlin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Estate of Paul Edmund Chamberlin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jane Doe
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Corporation X
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Corporation Y
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ralf Rastu
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Sarah Gleacher
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Kenneth Ryan
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Village of Sagaponack, New York
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
County of Ulster, New York
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Darcy Joan Chamberlin Grim
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/11/2016 10:17 AM EST |
Friday, March 29, 2013 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Darcy Joan Chamberlin Grim, FILED. [894307] 13-1189 [Entered: 04/02/2013 10:04 AM] | |
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/11/2013, RECEIVED.[894316] 13-1189 [Entered: 04/02/2013 10:07 AM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/13/2013, RECEIVED.[894318] 13-1189 [Entered: 04/02/2013 10:08 AM] |