Porter v. Steffen, et al
Original Case: 5:12-cv-00316
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:13-cv-06078 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2013 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2013 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 11, 2016 8:13 AM MST |
Defendant - Appellee
RODNEY P. STEFFEN, D.D.S., P.C., DBA MYDENTIST, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ADVANCED DENTAL IMPLANT AND DENTURE CENTER, INC., DBA MYDENTIST, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JESSICA A. PORTER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/11/2016 8:13 AM MST |
Monday, April 01, 2013 | ||
[10058324] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/01/2013 Fee is due by 04/15/2013 for Jessica A. Porter. Docketing statement due 04/15/2013 for Jessica A. Porter. Transcript order form due 04/15/2013 for Jana B. Leonard. Notice of appearance due on 04/15/2013 for Advanced Dental Implant and Denture Center, Inc., Jessica A. Porter and Rodney P. Steffen. 13-6078 |