Landi et al v. Home Depot USA, Inc. et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Sheri Polster Chappell |
Referred: | Mac R Mccoy |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00701 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 14, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 17, 2018 4:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Home Depot USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Makita USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Landi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lori Landi
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Leonard Gabourel
Terminated: 01/03/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 04, 2020 | ||
205 | 205
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 08/04 5:38 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 203 Defendants'/Judgment Creditors' Motion for Judgment Debtor to Complete Fact Information Sheet. Plaintiff/Judgment Debtor has not timely responded to the motion as required by M.D. Fla. R. 3.01(b). Accordingly, the Court deems the motion to be unopposed. Plaintiff/Judgment Debtor is ordered to complete the Fact Information Sheet (Form 1.977) (Doc. [203-1]) within 45 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 8/4/2020. (McCoy, Mac) |