Wallace Coats et al v. Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Josephine L Staton |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-02208 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable |
Case Filed: | Dec 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 17, 2018 2:04 AM PDT |
Defendant
Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Wallace Coats
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Kinnick
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, December 04, 2020 | ||
45 | 45
notice
Appearance
Fri 12/04 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Vernon Louis Ellicott on behalf of Plaintiffs Wallace Coats, James Kinnick (Attorney Vernon Louis Ellicott added to party Wallace Coats(pty:pla), Attorney Vernon Louis Ellicott added to party James Kinnick(pty:pla))(Ellicott, Vernon) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
transfer
MDL - Order
Thu 08/01 10:36 AM
ORDER DENYING TRANSFER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL No.: 2898. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the motion for centralization of these actions is denied. (jp) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 08/07 10:59 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES by Judge Josephine L. Staton. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 42(a), the above captioned actions are hereby consolidated for all purposes. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (es) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Tue 07/31 5:35 PM
Consolidated AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , filed by Plaintiffs Wallace Coats, James Kinnick(Schelkopf, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/02 8:12 AM
ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, GRANTING Joint Stipulation. [ 40] Plaintiffs shall have until July 31, 2018 to file a consolidated complaint or consolidated complaints against Hyundai and Kia. (See order for details) (es) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
5
pgs
stip
Order
Mon 06/25 8:08 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order Granting Proposed Schedule filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd..(Morgan, Shon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/15 8:52 AM
ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, on Joint Stipulation for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel38 . After consideration of Plaintiffs' Joint Stipulation for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel, the leadership structure as proposed in Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Counsel seeking the appointment of Matthew D. Schelkopf of Sauder Schelkopf and Adam Gonnelli of The Sultzer Law Group, P.C. to serve as Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel and Bonner Walsh of Walsh PLLC to serve as the executive committee, is hereby GRANTED. PURSUANT TO STIPULATION IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
7
pgs
stip
Order
Mon 06/11 6:22 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order Appointing Interim Class Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Wallace Coats, James Kinnick.(Schelkopf, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
minutes
Motion Hearing Appoint Counsel
Fri 06/08 3:39 PM
MINUTES OF Hearing on Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for the Appointment of Interim Class Counsel33 before Judge Josephine L. Staton. Hearing held. Court and counsel confer. Supplemental briefing shall be filed with 14 days as set forth on the record. Motion will be deemed under submission upon receipt of filing. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (dro) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 05/03 11:52 AM
ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File35 . The Parties will jointly file a proposed schedule for the filing of a consolidated complaint (or separate consolidated complaints against Hyundai and Kia) and a date for defendants response to the complaint(s). The parties shall file their proposed schedule within 10 days of the latter of (a) the transfer to this Court of the Smolek action or (b) the Courts resolution of the Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel. (twdb) |
|
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 04/30 3:36 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Schedule filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd..(Morgan, Shon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Non-Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/27 11:45 AM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel (Interim) 33 filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd.. (Morgan, Shon) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Appointment of Counsel
Wed 04/18 5:40 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel (Interim) filed by Plaintiffs Wallace Coats, James Kinnick. Motion set for hearing on 6/8/2018 at 02:30 PM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Schelkopf, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Matthew D. Schelkopf, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Schelkopf Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Adam Gonelli, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A to Gonelli Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order Appointing Interim Class Counsel | ||
32 | 32
order
Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
Wed 04/18 2:11 PM
ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,,31 , for the following reasons: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Prior to filing any motion, counsel are required to view the Court's Closed Motion Dates found under Judges' Procedures and Schedules on the Court's web site. Motion should be noticed for the first available date. (es) |
|
31 | 31
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 04/18 9:16 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel (Unopposed) 30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (dro) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Appointment of Counsel
Tue 04/17 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel (Unopposed) filed by Plaintiffs Wallace Coats, James Kinnick. (Schelkopf, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Matthew D. Schelkopf, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Schelkopf Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Adam Gonelli, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A to Gonelli Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 02/20 11:19 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by Judge Josephine L. Staton,28 . Defendants' response to the initial complaint is stayed pending resolution of the anticipated motion in Brogan v. Hyundai Motors America, 7:18-cv-00525 (S.D.N.Y.) and any consolidated amended complaint that might follow. Within 21 days of the resolution of a motion to stay or transfer the Brogan action, the parties will file a joint status report in this action that will either propose a schedule for plaintiffs to file a consolidated complaint and for defendants' response, or a date for Hyundai's response if no consolidated complaint is anticipated. (dv) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Wed 02/14 3:47 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd..(Morgan, Shon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
attorney
Change of Address
Tue 01/23 7:42 AM
NOTICE of Change of address by Adam R Gonnelli attorney for Plaintiffs Wallace Coats, James Kinnick. Changing attorneys address to Bonner Walsh, 1561 Long Haul Road, Grangeville, ID 83530. Filed by Plaintiffs Wallace Coats, James Kinnick. (Gonnelli, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 01/17 6:01 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd., identifying Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd.; Hyundai Motor America, Inc.; James Kinnick; Wallace Coats. (Morgan, Shon) |
|
25 | 25
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 01/17 5:56 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hyundai Motor America, Inc. answer now due 2/16/2018; Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. answer now due 2/16/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc.; Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd..(Attorney Shon Morgan added to party Hyundai Motor America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Shon Morgan added to party Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Morgan, Shon) |
|
24 | 24
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 01/17 10:12 AM
ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting23 Non-Resident Attorney Adam R. Gonnelli APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Kinnick, Wallace Coats, designating David C. Wright as local counsel. (dro) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Fri 01/12 11:03 AM
Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam R. Gonnelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Wallace Coats, James Kinnick (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 1/9/2018, Receipt No. 0973-21071317) filed by Plaintiffs Wallace Coats, James Kinnick. (Wright, David) |
|
Att: 1 Certificates of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 01/11 12:03 PM
ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, DENYING18 Non-Resident Attorney APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Application lists parties Houston Vinci and Jeahan Ku, who are not parties in this action. (es) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Wed 01/10 4:53 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam R. Gonnelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Wallace Coats, James Kinnick (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21071317)18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Application lists parties Houston Vinci and Jeahan Ku, however docket text has Wallace Coats and James Kinnick as represented parties. Information on PHV inconsistent with docket entry. (lt) |
|
20 | 20
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 01/10 11:46 AM
ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting14 Non-Resident Attorney Bonner C. Walsh APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs, designating David C. Wright as local counsel. (dro) |
|
19 | 19
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 01/10 11:45 AM
ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting12 Non-Resident Attorney Matthew D. Schelkopf APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs, designating David C. Wright as local counsel. (dro) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 01/09 12:52 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam R. Gonnelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Wallace Coats, James Kinnick (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21071317) filed by Plaintiffs Wallace Coats, James Kinnick. (Att achments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Wright, David) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 01/08 3:52 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Wallace Coats, James Kinnick, upon Defendant Hyundai Motor America, Inc. served on 12/27/2017, answer due 1/17/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriel Sanchez, Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Wright, David) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 01/05 3:48 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg) |
|
15 | 15
order
Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Fri 01/05 1:31 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV17-00838 JLS (JDEx). Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV17-02208 JLS (JDEx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (dro) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 12/28 12:17 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bonner C. Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Wallace Coats, James Kinnick (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21027555) filed by Plaintiffs Wallace Coats, James Kinnick. (Atta chments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Wright, David) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Tue 12/26 10:55 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 as to Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd.. (lwag) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Fri 12/22 12:22 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew D. Schelkopf to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Wallace Coats, James Kinnick (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21012480) filed by Plaintiffs Wallace Coats, James Kinnick. (Wright, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
notice
Summons Request
Fri 12/22 11:47 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiffs Wallace Coats, James Kinnick. (Wright, David) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Wed 12/20 6:52 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 4 Civil Cover Sheet, 5 Affidavit Consumer Legal Remedies Act Venue Affidavit of Wallace Coats, 6 Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties, 7 Proposed Summons should not have been attached. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs.. (ghap) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Wed 12/20 6:47 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Wed 12/20 6:45 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Adam Gonneli. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Wed 12/20 6:44 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Bonner Walsh. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Wed 12/20 6:43 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph B Kenney. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Wed 12/20 6:42 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Matthew D Schelkopf. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Wed 12/20 6:41 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph G Sauder. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) |
|
3 | 3
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 12/20 6:39 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 12/20 6:38 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 12/19 3:36 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20993434 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Wallace Coats, James Kinnick. (Attorney David C Wright added to party Wallace Coats(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party James Kinnick(pty:pla))(Wright, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Part 573 Safety Recall Report 15V-568, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- Part 573 Safety Recall Report 17V-226, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- Part 573 Safety Recall Report 17V-224, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit Consumer Legal Remedies Act Venue Affidavit of Wallace Coats, | ||
Att: 6 Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons |