Peter Gakuba v. Kate Kurtz, et al
Original Case: 3:13-cv-50112
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:13-cv-01707 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2013 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2013 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 11, 2016 9:39 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
KATE C. KURTZ, Assistant State's Attorney, Winnebago County, individually and officially
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
WINNEBAGO COUNTY STATE'S ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
STATE OF ILLINOIS, People or State
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN & JANE DOES, 1 through 25
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
PETER GAKUBA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/11/2016 8:24 AM CST |
Thursday, April 04, 2013 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Transcript information sheet due by 04/18/2013. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Peter Gakuba by 04/11/2013. [1] [6476499] 13-1707 (AD) | |
2 | 2 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [6476504] 13-1707 (AD) |