Frank Cridland v. Kmart Corp
Original Case: 5:12-cv-00157
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:13-cv-01949 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2013 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2013 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 11, 2016 9:47 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
KMART CORP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
FRANK CRIDLAND
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/11/2016 9:47 AM EST |
Friday, April 05, 2013 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TNH) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Frank Cridland in District Court No. 5-12-cv-00157. (TNH) |