Calvillo Manriquez et al v. DeVos et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sallie Kim |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-07210 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 18, 2018 2:03 AM PDT |
Amicus
Seth E Mermin
BERKELEY CENTER FOR LAW AND ECONOMIC JUSTICE UC Berkeley School of Law 225 Bancroft Way
Berkeley, CA 94720 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
People of the State of California
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Public Law Center
601 West Civic Center Drive
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elisabeth DeVos
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Education
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martin Calvillo Manriquez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamal Cornelius
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rthwan Dobashi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Craig
on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated 3548 Cosby Avenue
Baldwin Park, CA 91706 |
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 10 2022
Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(sklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2022) |
1. | Federal Judge Threatens Education Secretary With Possible Jail Time (govexec.com) |
Submitted Wed 10/09/2019 | |