Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC et al v. eClinicalWorks, LLC
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Richard G Stearns |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-12530 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 29, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 19, 2018 4:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
eClinicalWorks, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Perrin Curran
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
47 | 47
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 07/29 2:54 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (Pacho, Arnold) |
|
46 | 46
order
Order
Mon 07/29 2:53 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The court having confirmed the May 31, 2019 Arbitration award by consent of all parties dismissing all claimants' claims with prejudice, the Clerk is directed to close this case. (Pacho, Arnold) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
45 | 45
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 07/02 5:04 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting44 Motion To Join Family First Medical Center, P.A. Pursuant To FRCP Rule 20(a) And To Confirm The May 31, 2019 Arbitration Award. (Pacho, Arnold) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/01 4:33 PM
MOTION To Join Family First Medical Center, P.A. Pursuant To FRCP Rule 20(a) And To Confirm The May 31, 2019 Arbitration Award (UNOPPOSED MOTION) by eClinicalWorks, LLC.(Carroll, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Final Consent Award) | ||
Monday, June 10, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Status Report
Mon 06/10 10:10 AM
STATUS REPORT (Seventh Joint Status Report Regarding Arbitration) by Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC, Perrin Curran. (Roddy, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Status Report
Tue 04/09 2:40 PM
STATUS REPORT (Sixth Joint Status Report Regarding Arbitration) by Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC, Perrin Curran. (Roddy, John) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Status Report
Fri 02/08 4:16 PM
STATUS REPORT (Fifth Joint Status Report Regarding Arbitration) by Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC, Perrin Curran. (Roddy, John) |
|
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Status Report
Mon 12/10 2:38 PM
STATUS REPORT (Fourth Joint Status Report Regarding Arbitration) by Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC, Perrin Curran. (Roddy, John) |
|
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Status Report
Tue 10/09 4:29 PM
STATUS REPORT (Third Joint Status Report Regarding Arbitration) by Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC, Perrin Curran. (Roddy, John) |
|
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Status Report
Fri 08/10 12:26 PM
STATUS REPORT (Second Joint Status Report Regarding Arbitration) by Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC, Perrin Curran. (Roddy, John) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Status Report
Mon 06/11 10:36 AM
STATUS REPORT (First Joint Status Report Regarding Arbitration) by Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC, Perrin Curran. (Roddy, John) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order
Thu 05/17 11:50 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered directing the parties to file a status report regarding their arbitration proceedings every sixty days commencing on June 11, 2018, and within ten days of their completion of arbitration. SO ORDERED. (Zierk, Marsha) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Thu 03/29 3:45 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting20 Motion to Compel. Defendant eClinical Works, LLCs Motion to Compel Arbitration is ALLOWED and the matter is STAYED pending arbitration. The operative provision in the contract in question provides that "[i]n the event of any dispute, the parties agree that the first recourse to resolution shall be by arbitration, and that no action at law shall be taken by either party previous to an unsuccessful resolution by arbitration." It is axiomatic in the work of the federal courts that "questions of arbitrability must be addressed with a healthy regard for the federal policy favoring arbitration," Moses H. Cone Mem'l Hosp. v. Mercury Constr. Corp. , 460 U.S. 1, 24 (1983), particularly when, as here, the parties are both commercial entities. This strong presumption in favor of arbitration may "only [be] overcome if it may be said with 'positive assurance that the arbitration clause is not susceptible of an interpretation that covers the asserted dispute.'" First Sealord Sur., Inc. v. TLT Const. Corp. , 765 F. Supp. 2d 66, 72 (D. Mass. 2010) (citations omitted). As one other federal court has found in the course of interpreting the precise contractual language at issue, see SGC Health Grp., Inc. v. Eclinicalworks, LLC , 2016 WL 2595109 (N.D. Tex. May 4, 2016), the dispute settlement clause clearly stipulates that arbitration is an obligatory antecedent to judicial review, and the court agrees with this interpretation. The case will therefore be STAYED pending arbitration, and eClinical's Motion to Compel Arbitration is ALLOWED. (RGS, law2) |
|
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Thu 03/29 11:59 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting25 Assented to Motion to Seal. (Pacho, Arnold) |
|
order
~Util - Case Stayed
Thu 04/19 4:42 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Case stayed. (Pacho, Arnold) |
||
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Declaration
Wed 03/28 5:02 PM
DECLARATION re26 Opposition to Motion of Kara White by Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC, Perrin Curran.(Roddy, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (redacted) | ||
28 | 28
misc
Declaration
Wed 03/28 5:00 PM
DECLARATION re26 Opposition to Motion of Perrin Curran by Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC, Perrin Curran.(Roddy, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (redacted) | ||
27 | 27
misc
Declaration
Wed 03/28 4:58 PM
DECLARATION re26 Opposition to Motion of John T. Nicolaou by Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC, Perrin Curran.(Roddy, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 (filed under seal), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 (filed under seal), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 (filed under seal), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 (filed under seal), | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Opposition to Motion
Wed 03/28 4:53 PM
Opposition re20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And Dismiss The Proceeding Or, In The Alternative, Stay The Proceeding (Oral Argument Requested) filed by Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC, Perrin Curran. (Roddy, John) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Seal
Wed 03/28 4:51 PM
Assented to MOTION to Seal by Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC, Perrin Curran.(Roddy, John) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 02/22 9:01 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. While the court does not consider a 42-day response period a "short" amount of time where the rules prescribes 14 days, notwithstanding, the court will permit the extension until March 30, 2018, but no longer. (Zierk, Marsha) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 02/21 4:46 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And Dismiss The Proceeding Or, In The Alternative, Stay The Proceeding (Oral Argument Requested) by Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC, Perrin Curran.(Roddy, John) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Declaration
Fri 02/16 3:22 PM
DECLARATION re20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And Dismiss The Proceeding Or, In The Alternative, Stay The Proceeding (Oral Argument Requested) by eClinicalWorks, LLC.(Carroll, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
21 | 21
26
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 02/16 3:20 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration And Dismiss The Proceeding Or, In The Alternative, Stay The Proceeding (Oral Argument Requested) filed by eClinicalWorks, LLC. (Carroll, James) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Compel
Fri 02/16 3:17 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration And Dismiss The Proceeding Or, In The Alternative, Stay The Proceeding (Oral Argument Requested) by eClinicalWorks, LLC.(Carroll, James) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Wed 02/07 9:32 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Jessica D. Miller and Geoffrey M. Wyatt. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Pacho, Arnold) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/06 10:19 AM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jessica D. Miller and Geoffrey M. Wyatt Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-6996343 by eClinicalWorks, LLC.(Carroll, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Certification of Jessica D. Miller), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (Certification of Geoffrey M. Wyatt) | ||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Mon 01/22 10:32 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brett A. Ialacci. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Pacho, Arnold) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Mon 01/22 10:27 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jonathan D. Selbin. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Pacho, Arnold) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Mon 01/22 10:22 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John T. Nicolaou. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Pacho, Arnold) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Mon 01/22 9:59 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mark P. Chalos. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 01/19 2:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brett A. Ialacci Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6971084 by Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC, Perrin Curran.(Roddy, John) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Brett A. Ialacci | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 01/19 2:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jonathan D. Selbin Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6971070 by Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC, Perrin Curran.(Roddy, John) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Jonathan D. Selbin | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 01/19 2:43 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John T. Nicolaou Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6971062 by Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC, Perrin Curran.(Roddy, John) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of John T. Nicolaou | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 01/19 2:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mark P. Chalos Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6971022 by Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC, Perrin Curran.(Roddy, John) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Mark P. Chalos | ||
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 01/10 10:29 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: eClinicalWorks, LLC Answer due 2/16/2018 in accordance with docket entry 7. (Caruso, Stephanie) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 01/09 4:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed eClinicalWorks, LLC served on 12/27/2017, answer due 1/17/2018. (Roddy, John) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 01/09 10:37 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting6 Motion for Extension of Time until 2/16/2018, to file a Response to the Complaint. (Zierk, Marsha) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 01/08 1:23 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 16, 2018 to Move, Answer Or Otherwise Respond To1 Complaint by eClinicalWorks, LLC.(Carroll, James) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 01/08 1:16 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by eClinicalWorks, LLC. (Carroll, James) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 01/08 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Carroll on behalf of eClinicalWorks, LLC (Carroll, James) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 12/21 3:34 PM
Summons Issued as to eClinicalWorks, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Thu 12/21 3:19 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Halley, Taylor) |
|
1 | 1
60
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/21 1:06 PM
COMPLAINT against eClinicalWorks, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6938443 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Carrollton Family Clinic, LLC, Perrin Curran.(Roddy, John) (Attachment 5 replaced on 12/21/2017) (McDonagh, Christina). (Attachment 3 replaced on 12/21/2017) (McDonagh, Christina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Carrollton Family Clinic Contract (Redacted), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - ECW Contract 2009 (Redacted), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Signed Assignment of Claims & check copy (Redacted), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Corporate Integrity Agreement, | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Category Form |