Ronald Prater, et al v. Dakota Ball
Original Case: 6:12-cv-03493
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:13-cv-01977 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 30, 2013 |
Terminated: | May 09, 2013 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 11, 2016 5:06 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellant
Dakota Luke Ball
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Ronald C. Prater
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Deann Rae Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Gwendalyn Wonder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Lloyd Curtman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Lucille Curtman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/11/2016 5:06 AM CST |
Tuesday, April 30, 2013 | ||
Civil case docketed. [4031026] 13-1977 (JMH) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 4/29/13, Order & Judgment filed 4/24/13 & docket entries, [4031031] 13-1977 (JMH) | ||
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 06/10/2013. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Dakota Luke Ball due 06/10/2013. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4031032] 13-1977 (JMH) |