PALCISKO v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00946 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 24, 2018 4:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
|
|
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
|
|
Plaintiff
JEANNETTE PALCISKO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 12/28 2:35 PM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, #1 OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, #2 OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 12/26 1:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (RASMUSSEN, B KRISTIAN) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/26 1:32 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4056845.), filed by JEANNETTE PALCISKO. (RASMUSSEN, B KRISTIAN) |
|
Att: 1 SUMMONS FOR BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, | ||
Att: 2 SUMMONS FOR OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, | ||
Att: 3 SUMMONS FOR OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC |