Williams v. Papa John's International Inc et al
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Colin Stirling Bruce |
Referred: | Eric I Long |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02326 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Dec 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 06, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 24, 2018 4:03 AM CDT |
Defendant
HH Enterprises Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Papa John's International Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Papa John's USA Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica A Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 09/06 3:41 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/6/2019. Pursuant to Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice36 and Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this matter is hereby terminated. All pending motions are denied as moot and all scheduled deadlines and court settings are vacated.(JMB, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 09/05 3:22 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jessica A Williams. (Langacker, Ronald) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 08/01 11:16 AM
ORDER FOLLOWING REPORT OF SETTLEMENT entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/1/2019. The parties are directed to file a stipulation of dismissal signed by both parties within 35 days of the entry of this order. See written order. (JMB, ilcd) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 08/01 11:17 AM
Set Deadlines: Settlement Papers due by 9/5/2019 (JMB, ilcd) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 07/31 2:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held on 7/31/2019 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for the Plaintiff by Ronald Langacker. Appearance for the Defendant by Scott Dempsey. Settlement Conference continued from 7/24/2019. Parties report case is settled. 35 day order to be entered. (not recorded) (JMB, ilcd) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 07/24 4:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held on 7/24/2019 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance by the Plaintiff Jessica Williams with counsel Ronald Langacker. Appearance for the Defendants by Eric Todd, Whitney Waller and Scott Dempsey. Settlement Conference held. No settlement reached. (not recorded) (JMB, ilcd) |
||
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 07/24 4:23 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/24/2019. This case is set for a continuation of the Settlement Conference on July 31, 2019, at 2:00 P.M. by telephone from Urbana (Court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Only attorneys Langacker and Dempsey must be present for the call. (JMB, ilcd) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
minutes
Presettlement Conference - Plaintiff
Mon 07/22 4:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held on 7/22/2019 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for the Plaintiff by Ronald Langacker. Presettlement Conference with Plaintiff held by telephone. (Tape #not recorded.) (JMB, ilcd) |
||
minutes
Presettlement Conference - Defendant
Mon 07/22 4:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held on 7/22/2019 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for Defendant Papa John's International by Eric Todd. Presettlement Conference with Defendant held by telephone. (Tape #not recorded.) (JMB, ilcd) |
||
minutes
Presettlement Conference - Defendant
Mon 07/22 4:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held on 7/22/2019 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for the Defendant HH Enterprises Inc by Scott Dempsey. Presettlement Conference with Defendant held by telephone. (Tape #not recorded.) (JMB, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Letter
Thu 06/06 11:10 AM
Letter to counsel from Judge Long regarding settlement conference. (KE, ilcd) |
|
33 | 33
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 06/06 11:10 AM
ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/6/2019. A Settlement Conference is set for 7/24/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. A Pre-settlement Conference with Plaintiff's counsel is set for 7/22/2019 at 2:30 PM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. A Pre-settlement Conference with Defendants' counsel is set for 7/22/2019 at 3:00 PM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Confidential Settlement letters are due 7/16/2019. See written order. (KE, ilcd) |
|
minutes
Status Conference - Referral Judge ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 06/06 11:03 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held 6/6/2019 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for the Plaintiff by Ronald Langacker. Appearance for Defendants by Eric Todd and Scott Dempsey. Status Conference held by telephone. Status of case discussed. Settlement Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Written order to follow. (Tape #UR-B: 10:16 AM.) (KE, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 05/21 11:47 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 5/21/2019. A telephone status conference is set for 6/6/19 at 10:15 AM, before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The Court will initiate the call. (KE, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
minutes
Status Conference - Referral Judge ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 03/28 11:39 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held 3/28/2019 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for Plaintiff by Ronald Langacker. Appearance for Defendants by Eric Todd and Scott Dempsey. Revised Discovery Plan discussed. The following discovery deadlines are set: Initial disclosure due by 4/15/2019. Amended pleadings due by 5/15/2019. Joinder of parties due by 5/15/2019. Plaintiff`s expert disclosure and expert reports due by 6/10/2019. Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 7/8/2019. Defendant's expert disclosure and expert reports due by 8/12/2019. Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 9/16/2019. Discovery, including deposition of experts, due by 10/11/2019. Case dispositive motions due by 11/5/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom A in Urbana before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 3/17/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A in Urbana before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. (Tape #UR-B: 10:03 AM.) (KE, ilcd) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Discovery Plan - Proposed/Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Mon 03/25 3:56 PM
DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Papa John's International Inc, Papa John's USA Inc. (Kuehnel, Sarah) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/21 1:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jessica A Williams (Langacker, Ronald) |
|
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 02/28 4:09 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/28/2019. On January 11, 2019, by agreement of the parties, the Court stayed discovery until a ruling on the pending Motion to Dismiss was rendered. On February 13, 2019, the Court entered an Order29 denying the pending Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, the discovery stay is lifted. The parties are directed to submit a proposed revised discovery schedule for the Court's consideration prior to the March 28, 2019, Status Conference. (JMB, ilcd) |
||
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Wed 02/27 4:10 PM
ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Papa John's International Inc, Papa John's USA Inc.(Todd, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
20
pgs
order
Order
Wed 02/13 4:10 PM
ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 2/13/2019. Defendants Papa John's International, Inc., and Papa John's USA, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss18 is DENIED. This case is referred to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings in accordance with this Order. See written Order. (DS, ilcd) |
|
order
Order Striking/Vacating Document (NOT a motion)
Wed 02/13 4:08 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 2/13/2019. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(a) this court's Order28 is VACATED due to a typo appearing on page three of that Order. The corrected Order will be entered this date. The substance of the corrected Order is unchanged. (DS, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
20
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 02/12 2:21 PM
ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 2/12/2019. Defendants Papa John's International, Inc, and Papa John's USA, Inc's Motion to Dismiss18 is DENIED. This case is referred to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings in accordance with this order. See written order. (KE, ilcd) |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
minutes
Status Conference - Referral Judge ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 01/11 12:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held 1/11/2019 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for the Plaintiff by Ronald Langacker. Appearance for Defendants by Sarah Kuehnel and Scott Dempsey. Status Conference held by telephone. Status of case and discovery discussed. By agreement of the parties, discovery is stayed until a ruling on the pending Motion to Dismiss is rendered. Status Conference set for 3/28/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Parties to submit a proposed amended schedule by 3/25/2019. (Miscellaneous Deadline 3/25/2019) (Tape #UR-B: 10:01 AM.) (KE, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, January 03, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Certificate
Thu 01/03 5:54 PM
CERTIFICATE Of Service . (Dempsey, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference - Referral Judge ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 12/19 10:36 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held 12/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for the Plaintiff by Ronald Langacker. Appearance for Defendants by Sarah Kuehnel and Scott Dempsey. Status Conference held by telephone. Status of case and discovery discussed. Further Status Conference set for 1/11/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (Tape #UR-B: 10:00 AM.) (KE, ilcd) |
||
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Wed 11/07 3:27 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 11/7/2018. On October 23, 2018, Plaintiff filed a Motion to Compel24 indicating that Defendant HH Enterprises had failed to respond to her discovery requests. On November 6, 2018, Defendant HH Enterprises filed its Response26 indicating that following Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, Defendant subsequently responded to Plaintiff's outstanding discovery. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion to Compel24 is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff is granted leave to refile her motion to compel if she believes Defendant's discovery production remains deficient. (KE, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Response to Motion/Petition
Tue 11/06 4:14 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re24 MOTION to Compel Defendant, HH Enterprises, Inc. filed by Defendant HH Enterprises Inc. (Dempsey, Scott) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Certificate
Tue 11/06 3:28 PM
CERTIFICATE Of Service . (Dempsey, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Compel
Tue 10/23 4:31 PM
MOTION to Compel Defendant, HH Enterprises, Inc. by Plaintiff Jessica A Williams. Responses due by 11/6/2018(Langacker, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Certificate
Fri 10/05 4:12 PM
CERTIFICATE Of Service . (Dempsey, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference - Referral Judge ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 10/02 1:22 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held 10/2/2018 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for the Plaintiff by Ronald Langacker. Appearance for Defendants by Eric Todd and Scott Dempsey. Status Conference held by telephone. Status of discovery and case discussed. Further Status Conference set for 12/19/2018 at 9:45 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (Tape #UR-B: 10:07 AM.) (KE, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference - Referral Judge ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 06/26 11:28 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held 6/26/2018 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for the Plaintiff by Ronald Langacker. Appearance for Defendants by Sarah Kuehnel and Scott Dempsey. Status Conference held by telephone. Status of case discussed. Status of discovery discussed. Further Status Conference set for 10/2/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (Tape #UR-B: 10:49 AM.) (KE, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 06/21 2:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jessica A Williams (Langacker, Ronald) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 06/08 10:25 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants Papa John's International Inc, Papa John's USA Inc. (Todd, Eric) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 05/31 1:43 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Papa John's International Inc, Papa John's USA Inc. Responses due by 6/14/2018 (Todd, Eric) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 05/31 4:05 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 5/31/2018. Defendant Papa John's International Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss20 is GRANTED. Papa John's has up to and including June 8, 2018, to file their Reply.(KE, ilcd) |
||
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response to Motion/Petition
Wed 05/30 3:56 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Jessica A Williams.(Langacker, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement | ||
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 05/16 12:07 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Papa John's International Inc, Papa John's USA Inc. Responses due by 5/30/2018(Kuehnel, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 05/02 11:34 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 5/2/2018. Due to Plaintiff's filing their Amended Complaint17 , Defendants' Motion to Dismiss11 is DENIED as MOOT. Defendants are granted 14 days, up to and including May 16, 2018, within which to refile or renew their motion to dismiss. (Miscellaneous Deadline 5/16/2018) (KE, ilcd) |
||
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 04/30 11:57 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jessica A Williams.(Langacker, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M | ||
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/26 1:55 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jessica A Williams (Langacker, Ronald) |
|
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/20 11:23 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by HH Enterprises Inc.(Dempsey, Scott) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
minutes
Scheduling Conference - Rule 16 ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/02 1:25 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held 4/2/18 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for Plaintiff by Ronald Langacker. Appearance for Defendant by Sarah Kuehnel and Dempsey. Rule 16 conference held by telephone. Oral motion by plaintiff to extend response deadline to Motion11 ; no objections. Oral motion granted. Response deadline to Motion11 extended to 4/30/18. Plan approved; dates set. Consent to magistrate judge discussed (form attached). ADR options offered, including court-hosted settlement conference. The following discovery deadlines are set: Initial disclosure due by 5/1/2018. Amended pleadings due by 6/1/2018. Joinder of parties due by 6/1/2018. Plaintiff's expert disclosure due by 8/31/2018. Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 10/1/2018. Defendant's expert disclosure due by 11/1/2018. Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 11/30/2018. Discovery, including deposition of experts, due by 2/1/2019. Case dispositive motions due by 4/15/2019. Status Conference set for 6/26/2018 at 10:45 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long to discuss possible court hosted mediation or summary trial. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A in Urbana before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce; Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 9/10/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A in Urbana before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce.( Responses due by 4/30/2018). (Tape #UR-B 11:20 AM.) (SKR, ilcd) (SKR, ilcd) |
|
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/02 1:15 PM
ORAL MOTION to extend time to respond to Motion11 by Plaintiff Jessica A Williams. Responses due by 4/16/2018 (SKR, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 03/29 2:20 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/29/18. Defendant HH Enterprises' Motion for Extension of Time within Which to Plead10 is GRANTED. Defendant HH Enterprises' deadline to file a responsive pleading is extended to April 19, 2018. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default8 is DENIED as moot. (KM, ilcd) |
||
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Interest
Wed 03/28 2:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Papa John's USA Inc. (Kuehnel, Sarah) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Interest
Wed 03/28 2:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Papa John's International Inc. (Kuehnel, Sarah) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss
Wed 03/28 2:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Defendants Papa John's International Inc, Papa John's USA Inc. Responses due by 4/11/2018 (Kuehnel, Sarah) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 03/27 11:39 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Defendant HH Enterprises Inc. Responses due by 4/10/2018 (Dempsey, Scott) |
|
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 03/27 9:38 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/27/2018. This Court has reviewed the parties' Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting9 and pursuant to the Order6 scheduling this matter for a Rule 16 hearing conference by personal appearance on April 2, 2018 at 11:15 A.M., the matter is hereby converted from personal appearance to telephone conference on the same date at the same time. The Court will initiate the call. (KE, ilcd) |
||
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Mon 03/26 9:43 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jessica A Williams. (Langacker, Ronald) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 03/23 1:03 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to HH Enterprises by Plaintiff Jessica A Williams. Responses due by 4/6/2018(Langacker, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 03/23 11:25 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Registered Agent on 1/4/2018, filed by Jessica A Williams. (Langacker, Ronald) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
21
pgs
order
Order Setting Scheduling Conference (Rule 16)
Tue 02/27 2:14 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/27/2018. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/2/2018 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written order. (KE, ilcd) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 02/27 2:11 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/27/2018. Defendants' Second Consent Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline5 is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to file their responsive pleading is extended to March 28, 2018. (KE, ilcd) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines (including Answer ddl)
Tue 02/27 2:12 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Papa John's International Inc answer due 3/28/2018; Papa John's USA Inc answer due 3/28/2018. (KE, ilcd) |
||
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 02/23 8:08 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by Defendants Papa John's International Inc, Papa John's USA Inc. Responses due by 3/9/2018 (Kuehnel, Sarah) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 01/26 9:05 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/26/2016. Defendants' Consent Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline3 is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to file a responsive pleading is extended to February 26, 2018. (KE, ilcd) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines (including Answer ddl)
Fri 01/26 9:06 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Papa John's International Inc answer due 2/26/2018; Papa John's USA Inc answer due 2/26/2018. (KE, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance of Attorney
Thu 01/25 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Eric A Todd on behalf of Papa John's International Inc, Papa John's USA Inc (Todd, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 01/24 7:56 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Defendants Papa John's International Inc, Papa John's USA Inc. Responses due by 2/7/2018 (Kuehnel, Sarah) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 12/28 2:19 PM
Summons Issued as to HH Enterprises Inc, Papa John's USA Inc and mailed to plaintiff's counsel for service. (TC, ilcd) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Attorney Complaint
Tue 12/26 11:31 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2735385.), filed by Jessica A Williams.(Langacker, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 14 Civil Cover Sheet |