TZU Technologies LLC v. Interactive Holdings Limited et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John A Kronstadt |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-09279 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 15:1126 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 29, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 27, 2018 1:42 AM PDT |
Defendant
Interactive Holdings Limited
|
|
Defendant
Xplosion Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
TZU Technologies LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
3
pgs
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 06/25 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff TZU Technologies LLC. Dismissal is With prejudice. (Edmondson, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Dismissing Case
Thu 05/03 12:34 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. Dkt.27 (ake) |
|
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
3
pgs
notice
Settlement
Wed 05/02 9:17 AM
NOTICE of Settlement pending payment per agreement filed by Plaintiff TZU Technologies LLC. (Edmondson, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Tue 04/10 5:12 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Effective, April 11, 2018, Judge Chooljian will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse ("Roybal Building"), located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 750 on the 7th floor of the Roybal Building. All mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside of the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Building. Paper civil and criminal documents exempted from electronic filing shall be filed in Room 180 on the Terrace Level of the Roybal Building. Magistrate Judge Chooljian's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Kerri Hays, may be reached at (213) 894-2921. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) |
|
25 | 25
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 04/10 2:27 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT INTERACTIVE HOLDINGS LIMITED by Judge John A. Kronstadt: On April 5, 2018, Plaintiff responded to the Order to Show Cause as to why this Defendant should not be dismissed. Dkt. 2223 . In light of the tentative settlement, the Court sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for June 4, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. If the parties file a dismissal by 12:00 pm on June 1, 2018, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance by counsel will be required. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) |
|
24 | 24
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 04/10 2:25 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT XPLOSION, INC. by Judge John A. Kronstadt: On February 16, 2018, default was entered against Defendant, Xplosion, Inc. Dkt.19 . The Court sets the hearing on the motion for default judgment for June 4, 2018 at 8:30 am, which shall be served on Defendant and filed with the Court no later than April 30, 2018. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Response
Thu 04/05 7:51 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff TZU Technologies LLCto Text Only Scheduling Notice,,,, 22 (Edmondson, Joseph) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 03/30 9:36 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION RE DEFENDANT INTERACTIVE HOLDINGS LIMITED by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than April 6, 2018, why this Defendant should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In the absence of showing good cause, an action or defendant shall be dismissed if the summons and complaint have not been served within 90 days after the filing of the complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). An action or defendant may be dismissed prior to such time if the Plaintiff fails diligently to prosecute the action. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of an appropriate response. No oral argument will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will consider the filing of a responsive pleading to the complaint and/or proof of service, which indicates proper service in full compliance with the federal rules, on or before the date upon which the response is due, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
30+
pgs
order
Order
Mon 02/26 8:51 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTATD. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) |
|
20 | 20
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 02/23 12:06 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt, United States District Judge. The case number will now read: LA CV17-09279 JAK (JCx). Because all pleadings are routed using the judge's initials, please be sure to use the initials JAK in place of the initials PJW on all future filings. Judge Kronstadt's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Andrea Keifer, can be reached at 213.894.2156.15 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Thu 02/22 8:49 AM
AMENDED DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Xplosion, Inc., a Nevada company (bp) |
|
18 | 18
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Fri 02/16 1:07 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Explosion Inc., a Nevada company (bp) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 02/15 4:03 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Attorney for Plaintiff TZU Technologies LLC, re REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Xplosion Inc.16 served on 02/15/2018. (Edmondson, Joseph) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Thu 02/15 4:01 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Xplosion Inc. filed by Attorney for Plaintiff TZU Technologies LLC. (Edmondson, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Kiren Rockenstein In Support of Request for Entry of Judgment | ||
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Fri 02/09 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:17-cv-09279 JAK (JCx). (esa) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Fri 02/09 2:19 PM
Decline Magistrate Judge - Form CV-11C filed by Plaintiff TZU Technologies LLC (Edmondson, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form
Tue 02/06 3:26 PM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (sbou) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 01/26 4:50 PM
SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff TZU Technologies LLC, upon Defendant Xplosion Inc. served on 1/25/2018, answer due 2/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Edmondson, Joseph) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/12 4:20 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Xplosion Inc. (im) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/12 4:16 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Interactive Holdings Limited. (im) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Summons Request
Wed 01/03 11:06 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Attorney for Plaintiff TZU Technologies LLC. (Edmondson, Joseph) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Summons Request
Wed 01/03 11:05 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Attorney for Plaintiff TZU Technologies LLC. (Edmondson, Joseph) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Wed 01/03 7:45 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request5 , Summons Request4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form
Wed 01/03 7:41 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (car) |
|
Att: 1 CV-11C | ||
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Fri 12/29 10:31 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Attorney for Plaintiff TZU Technologies LLC. (Edmondson, Joseph) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 12/29 10:29 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Attorney for Plaintiff TZU Technologies LLC. (Edmondson, Joseph) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 12/29 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Attorney for Plaintiff TZU Technologies LLC, (Edmondson, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 12/29 10:22 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff TZU Technologies LLC. (Edmondson, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
22
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 12/29 10:18 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21032396 - Fee: $400, filed by Attorney for Plaintiff TZU Technologies LLC. (Attorney Joseph Curtis Edmondson added to party TZU Technologies LLC(pty:pla))(Edmondson, Joseph) |