3M Company et al v. Elo Touch Solutions, Inc.
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Maryellen Noreika |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00011 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 03, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 04, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 02, 2018 5:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
Elo Touch Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
3M Innovative Properties Company
|
Represented By
|
1. | 3M files lawsuit against Elo Touch Solutions Inc. for alleged patent violation (digitalsignagetoday.com) |
Submitted Mon 01/22/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
51 | 51
misc
Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
Mon 02/04 11:20 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s).(mdb) |
|
Att: 1 Stipulation of Dismissal | ||
50 | 50
order
SO ORDERED ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 02/04 11:13 AM
SO ORDERED re49 Stipulation of Dismissal. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/4/2019. (dlw) |
|
49 | 49
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 02/04 10:58 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by 3M Company, 3M Innovative Properties Company. (Bove, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 01/30 9:53 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, the Markman Hearing is reset for 4/26/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Maryellen Noreika. (dlw) |