Tolliver et al. vs. Lyon County School District, et al.
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Larry R Hicks |
Referred: | William G Cobb |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00003 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 04, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 03, 2018 2:18 AM PDT |
Defendant
Lyon County School District
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Yerington, City Of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J.T.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Marriott-Tolliver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
T.M.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Tolliver
|
Represented By
|
1. | Two Teens File Racial Harassment Lawsuit Against Yerington High School (ktvn.com) |
Submitted Fri 01/05/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
49 | 49
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal Order Dismissing Case
Tue 06/26 4:29 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.48 Stipulation for Dismissal of this case in its entirety with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) |
|
48 | 48
motion
Stipulation Dismissal
Tue 06/26 9:02 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice and Proposed Order by Defendant Lyon County School District. (Alexander, Ann) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
47 | 47
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Seal Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 06/25 10:43 AM
ORDER that plaintiffs' motion for leave to file petitions to compromise minors claim under seal ECF No.42 is GRANTED ; the Court approves the petitions to compromise T.M.'s claim ECF Nos. 43 and 44 in accordance with the findings outlined; petitioner to file proof that a blocked financial investment account has been established with the settlement funds within thirty days of receiving said funds. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
46 | 46
respm
Non-Opposition to Motion
Thu 06/14 9:58 AM
NON-OPPOSITION to42 Motion to Seal by Defendant Yerington, City Of. (Parks, Katherine) |
|
45 | 45
respm
Non-Opposition to Motion
Thu 06/14 9:12 AM
NON-OPPOSITION to42 Motion to Seal by Defendant Lyon County School District. (Alexander, Ann) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
motion
Motion Seal
Tue 06/12 5:37 PM
MOTION to Seal by Plaintiffs J.T., Nancy Marriott-Tolliver, T.M., Charles Tolliver. (Doyle, Kerry) |
|
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
minutes
Settlement Conference Order on Motion for Attorney Fees ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 05/17 4:08 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Settlement Conference held on 5/16/2018 before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Dionna Negrete ; Pla Counsel: Terri Keyser-Cooper and Kerry S. Doyle ; Def Counsel: Ann M. Alexander and Katherine Parks ; Court Reporter: FTR ; Time of Hearing: 2:54 - 3:00 p.m. ; Recording start and end times: 2:54:58 - 3:00:04 ; Courtroom: 3 . The Court conducts settlement negotiations with the parties in chambers. The parties have reached a settlement agreement. The terms of the settlement are placed on the record and is sealed. Plaintiff's Interim Motion for Attorney Fees [ECF No. 40] is Moot. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulation to Dismiss the case within 45 days, on/before 7/2/18. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DBN) Modified on 5/17/2018 (DBN) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
motion
Motion Attorney Fees
Mon 05/07 2:14 PM
Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs'Motion For Interim Attorneys' Fee by Plaintiff Charles Tolliver. Responses due by 5/21/2018. (Keyser-Cooper, Terri) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-5, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 9-12 | ||
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 04/18 9:59 AM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Discovery Status Conference held on 4/16/2018 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Crtrm Administrator: Katie Lynn Ogden ; Pla Counsel: Terri Keyser-Cooper and Kerry Doyle (telephonically) ; Def Counsel: Ann Alexander (telephonically) obo Lyon County School District and Katherine Parks (telephonically) obo City of Yerington ; Court Reporter: FTR ; Time of Hearing: 11:30 a.m. ; Recording start and end times: 11:29:21 a.m. - 11:51:01 a.m. ; Courtroom: 2 . The court and counsel discuss a dispute that was raised during a deposition. The court offers its guidance. If a further hearing becomes necessary, counsel shall advise Ms. Ogden. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO) |
|
38 | 38
minord
Minute Order Setting Hearing
Mon 04/16 8:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/16/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Katie Lynn Ogden. A discovery status conference is scheduled for Monday, 4/16/2018, at 11:30 a.m. , in Reno Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Counsel wishing to appear telephonically shall dial 1-877-873-8017 , enter the access code 3416460 , and enter the security code 41618 approximately five (5) minutes prior to the hearing. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO) |
|
37 | 37
7
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Protective Order
Mon 04/16 7:35 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 35 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 04/13 3:08 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.34 Stipulation Regarding Compliance with FERPA When Disclosing Education Records of Non-Plaintiff Students in Lyon County School District re ECF No.33 Minute Order. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/13/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Stipulation
Thu 04/12 2:35 PM
STIPULATION re Discovery Stipulated Protection Order by Defendant Yerington, City Of. (Parks, Katherine) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Stipulation
Tue 04/10 9:39 AM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order Re Compliance with FERPA When Disclosing Education Records re33 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing,,, by Defendant Lyon County School District. (Alexander, Ann) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
minutes
Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Fri 04/06 12:40 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing held on 4/5/2018 before Judge Larry R. Hicks. Crtrm Administrator: Dionna Negrete ; Pla Counsel: Terri Keyser-Cooper and Kerry S. Doyle ; Def Counsel: Ann M. Alexander and Katherine Parks ; Court Reporter: Margaret Griener ; Time of Hearing: 2:04 - 3:20 p.m. ; Courtroom: 3 . Court convenes. Counsel state their appearances for the record. Counsel present their respective arguments. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction [ECF No. 3] is granted. IT IS ORDERED that a proposed protective order shall be submitted to the Court on/before 4/16/18. IT IS FURHTER ORDERED that defense counsel Ann Alexandra shall submit information regarding FERPA to the Court by 4/10/18. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court adjourns. (See attached for specifics) (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DBN) (DBN) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice Setting Hearing
Tue 03/13 1:35 PM
NOTICE Setting Hearing: IT IS ORDERED that oral argument regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction [ECF No. 3], shall be heard on Thursday, 4/5/18, at 2:00 p.m. in Reno Courtroom 3 before Judge Larry R. Hicks. Any supplemental briefing shall be submitted on/before Friday, 3/16/18; Responses are due on/before Friday, 3/23/18. Counsel have been notified of and are in agreement with the date and time. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (DBN) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
4
pgs
order
Order Setting Settlement Conference
Tue 03/06 8:24 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 5/16/2018 at 9:00 A.M. in Reno Chambers before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr. Settlement Conference Statements to be received in Clerk's Office, Room 301, Not Later Than 4:00 P.M. on 05/09/2018. DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL . Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 3/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 03/02 3:55 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 2/26/2018 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Crtrm Administrator: Katie Lynn Ogden ; Pla Counsel: Terri Keyser-Cooper and Kerry Doyle (present) ; Def Counsel: Ann Alexander (present obo Lyon County School District) and Katherine Parks (present obo City of Yerington) ; Court Reporter: FTR ; Time of Hearing: 1:30 p.m. ; Recording start and end times: 1:34:30 p.m. - 1:43:28 p.m. ; Courtroom: 2 . The court and counsel discuss the status of the case. The court proposes that a settlement conference be scheduled either Wednesday, 5/16/2018, or Thursday, 5/17/2018, at 9:00 a.m. before Judge McQuaid. Counsel shall advise Ms. Ogden if their respective client(s) wish to proceed with a settlement conference and if so which date is satisfactory. Once a date is confirmed the court will enter a separate order scheduling the settlement conference. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice Manual Filing
Thu 02/22 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Manual Filing by Plaintiffs J.T., Nancy Marriott-Tolliver, T.M., Charles Tolliver re27 Reply,. Object: Color photographs,, Description: Color reproductions of Snapchat Posts, manually filed with the Clerk's Office. (Doyle, Kerry) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Reply
Thu 02/22 1:43 PM
REPLY to Response to3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiffs J.T., Nancy Marriott-Tolliver, T.M., Charles Tolliver. (Doyle, Kerry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit New York Times Article dated Feb. 8, 2018, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Letter from LCSD Counsel, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of J.T., | ||
Att: 4 Declaration Declaration of S.E., | ||
Att: 5 Declaration Declaration of T.M., | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Behavior Detail Report for J.T., | ||
Att: 7 Declaration Declaration of Terri Keyser-Cooper | ||
27 | 27
respm
Reply
Thu 02/22 1:01 PM
REPLY to Response to3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiffs J.T., Nancy Marriott-Tolliver, T.M., Charles Tolliver. (Doyle, Kerry) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of J.T., | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of T.M., | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Handwritten Notes of Ann Alexander, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Letter by Ann Alexander, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 8x10 Color Prints filed by Manual Submission, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration Declaration of S.E., | ||
Att: 7 Declaration Declaration of Terri Keyser-Cooper | ||
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Case Management Report
Wed 02/14 4:44 PM
Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Plaintiffs J.T., Nancy Marriott-Tolliver, T.M., Charles Tolliver (Doyle, Kerry) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 02/12 2:33 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re24 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/30/2018 . Motions due by 8/29/2018 . Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/28/2018 . Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order
Mon 02/12 1:00 PM
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Yerington, City Of (Parks, Katherine) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response
Thu 02/08 4:55 PM
RESPONSE to3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Defendant Lyon County School District. Replies due by 2/15/2018. (Alexander, Ann) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response
Thu 02/08 9:39 AM
RESPONSE to3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Defendant Yerington, City Of. Replies due by 2/15/2018. (Parks, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 and 2 | ||
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 02/01 11:33 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.19 Second Stipulation for an Extension of Time for Defendants to file a response to ECF No.3 Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction and for Plaintiff's reply to the response. Defendants' response due by 2/8/2018 . Plaintiffs' reply due by 2/22/2018 . Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) |
|
20 | 20
minord
Minute Order
Thu 02/01 10:24 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/1/2018. Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2018 at 1:30 P.M. in Reno Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Counsel wishing to appear telephonically shall dial 1-877-873-8017 , enter the access code 3416460 , and enter the security code 22618 approximately (5) minutes prior to the hearing. The parties to jointly file the case management report not less than (7) days before the case management conference. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Stipulation
Wed 01/31 5:05 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Defendant Lyon County School District. (Alexander, Ann) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Tue 01/30 2:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Yerington, City Of. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Parks, Katherine) |
|
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 01/30 2:11 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Yerington, City Of.(Parks, Katherine) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Mon 01/29 4:57 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lyon County School District. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Alexander, Ann) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 01/29 4:56 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Lyon County School District. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/15/2018.(Alexander, Ann) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice Other
Fri 01/19 9:07 AM
NOTICE re: Remittal of Disqualification by Lyon County School District re11 Minute Order. (Alexander, Ann) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 01/17 10:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Tolliver re ECF Nos.7 Summons Issued and1 Complaint. Lyon County School District served on 1/16/2018, answer due 2/6/2018. (KW) |
|
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 01/17 10:30 AM
ORDER approving ECF No.10 Stipulation re ECF No.3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Response due by 2/1/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
minord
Minute Order
Tue 01/16 3:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/16/2018 : NOTICE OF REMITTAL OF DISQUALIFICATION. Notice is due by 2/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Stipulation
Tue 01/16 9:12 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Defendant Lyon County School District. (Alexander, Ann) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice Appearance
Fri 01/12 1:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ann M Alexander on behalf of Defendant Lyon County School District. (Alexander, Ann) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice Appearance
Fri 01/12 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine F. Parks on behalf of Defendant Yerington, City Of. (Parks, Katherine) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/05 7:54 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lyon County School District and City of Yerington. (LH) |
|
Att: 1 Lyon County School District | ||
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Thu 01/04 12:18 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Charles Tolliver. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Keyser-Cooper, Terri) |
|
5 | 5
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Thu 01/04 10:56 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued City of Yerington by Plaintiff Charles Tolliver. (Keyser-Cooper, Terri) |
|
4 | 4
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Thu 01/04 10:55 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Lyon County School District by Plaintiff Charles Tolliver. (Keyser-Cooper, Terri) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Motion Preliminary Injunction
Thu 01/04 10:54 AM
First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Charles Tolliver. Responses due by 1/18/2018. (Keyser-Cooper, Terri) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ext. 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh 2-3, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh 4-6, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh. 7-8, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh. 9-13, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exh. 14-16 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 01/04 10:32 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET to1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Charles Tolliver. (Keyser-Cooper, Terri) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/04 10:30 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4915904) by Charles Tolliver. Proof of service due by 4/4/2018.(Keyser-Cooper, Terri) |
|
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Thu 01/04 11:20 AM
Case assigned to Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. ***Emergency motion previously filed in case.*** (WJ) |