Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 73.189.214.23
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Nathanael M Cousins |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-00081 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 04, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 03, 2018 2:10 AM PDT |
Defendant
JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 73.189.214.23
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 05/03 6:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of John Doe Subscriber Assigned IP Address 73.189.214.23 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 5/3/2018) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Ex Parte Application
Tue 04/24 8:44 AM
ORDER GRANTING Ex Parte Application For Extension Of Time Within Which To Effectuate Service On John Doe Defendant 13 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Ex Parte Application
Tue 04/03 6:31 PM
Ex Parte Application re10 Order on Ex Parte Application For Extension Of Time Within Which To Effectuate Service On John Doe Defendant filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 4/3/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Ex Parte Application
Thu 03/29 7:35 PM
ORDER GRANTING Ex Parte Application 11 . Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2018. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Ex Parte Application
Wed 03/28 6:10 PM
Ex Parte Application re6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines For Adjournment Of The Initial Case Management Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 3/28/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Ex Parte Application
Tue 02/20 2:17 PM
ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE OT SERVE A THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26 CONFERENCE. Re: Dkt. No. 9 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Ex Parte Application
Mon 01/29 8:09 PM
Ex Parte Application For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 1/29/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 01/09 6:22 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 1/9/2018) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Patent/Trademark Copy
Fri 01/05 1:05 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2018) |
|
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 01/05 1:00 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2018) |
|
5 | 5
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Fri 01/05 10:31 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge BY 1/19/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2018) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 01/05 8:26 AM
Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/19/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2018) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re2 Certificate of Interested Entities,1 Complaint, RE FILING OF RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 1/4/2018) | |
2 | 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate John Doe, Defendant for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. re1 Complaint, (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 1/4/2018) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 73.189.214.23 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11998113.). Filed byStrike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 1/4/2018) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |