Southwest Airlines Co v. Roundpipe LLC et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | A Joe Fish |
Referred: | Renee Harris Toliver |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00033 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark |
Case Filed: | Jan 05, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 28, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 04, 2018 4:04 AM CDT |
Defendant
Chase Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Roundpipe LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pavel Yurevich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Southwest Airlines Co
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office
Tue 05/28 1:38 PM
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Final Order. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (axm) |
|
37 | 37
order
Judgment
Tue 05/28 1:35 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/28/2019) (axm) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 05/24 1:35 PM
MOTION Agreed Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction filed by Southwest Airlines Co (Pegues, Michael) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
43
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Fri 03/22 3:02 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court DENIES the23 defendants' motion to dismiss. Additionally, because the court denies the defendants' motion, the court DENIES29 Southwest's request to dismiss and motion for attorneys' fees as moot. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/22/2019) (axm) |
|
Saturday, October 13, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Response/Objection
Sat 10/13 11:38 AM
RESPONSE filed by Chase Roberts, Roundpipe LLC, Pavel Yurevich re:31 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses (Roberts, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Appendix | ||
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Appendix in Support
Tue 09/25 5:23 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Southwest Airlines Co re32 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery Responses (Pegues, Michael) |
|
32 | 32
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Tue 09/25 5:21 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Southwest Airlines Co re31 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses (Pegues, Michael) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Compel
Tue 09/25 5:20 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Southwest Airlines Co (Pegues, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
7
pgs
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 07/03 12:21 PM
RESPONSE filed by Chase Roberts, Roundpipe LLC, Pavel Yurevich re:29 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' TCPA Ground (Roberts, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
9
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Tue 06/12 3:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' TCPA Ground filed by Southwest Airlines Co (Pegues, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/17 10:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Jason Wietjes and Attorney Withdrawal of Richard Juang filed by Southwest Airlines Co (Wietjes, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Reply
Tue 04/10 12:27 PM
REPLY filed by Chase Roberts, Roundpipe LLC, Pavel Yurevich re:23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Roberts, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Appendix in Support
Tue 03/27 9:24 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Southwest Airlines Co re25 Response/Objection to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Pegues, Michael) |
|
25 | 25
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 03/27 9:22 PM
RESPONSE filed by Southwest Airlines Co re:23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Pegues, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Tue 03/06 9:45 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Chase Roberts, Roundpipe LLC, Pavel Yurevich re23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Roberts, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Appendix, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order granting Motion to Dismiss | ||
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 03/06 9:43 AM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Chase Roberts, Roundpipe LLC, Pavel Yurevich (Roberts, Charles) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 03/02 12:17 PM
ORDER withdrawing17 Motion to Transfer, granting21 Unopposed motion to set deadline for defendants' response to complaint. Defendants shall electronically file their response to the plaintiff's complaint no later than 3/12/2018. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/2/2018) (aaa) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
3
pgs
motion
Withdraw Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 02/26 12:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw17 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division to the District of Utah Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer , Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiff's Complaint () filed by Chase Roberts, Roundpipe LLC, Pavel Yurevich with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Roberts, Charles) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Mon 02/26 9:32 AM
ORDER granting19 Agreed Motion to Extend Time. Response due by 2/27/2018. Reply due by 3/13/2018. No further extensions will be granted. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/23/2018) (ran) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 02/20 5:08 PM
Agreed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Transfer filed by Southwest Airlines Co (Pegues, Michael) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 02/05 4:43 PM
ORDER granting14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard Juang. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/5/2018) (sss) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Transfer Case Out of District/Division
Wed 01/31 6:43 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division to the District of Utah , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Chase Roberts, Roundpipe LLC, Pavel Yurevich with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Roberts, Charles). Added Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer on 2/1/2018 (zkc). |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Appendix, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 01/31 6:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chase Roberts, Roundpipe LLC, Pavel Yurevich. (Roberts, Charles) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned
Mon 01/29 1:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Pavel Yurevich; served on 1/10/2018. (zkc) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/23 10:13 AM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8937256) filed by Southwest Airlines CoAttorney Richard Juang added to party Southwest Airlines Co(pty:pla) (Juang, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 01/18 9:33 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/18/2018) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/18 8:45 AM
STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE: ALL discovery matters in this case are hereby REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver for a hearing, if necessary, and for determination. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/17/2018) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned
Wed 01/17 4:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Chase Roberts; served on 1/5/2018. (ykp) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 01/17 2:26 PM
MOTION leave to proceed without local counsel filed by Chase Roberts, Roundpipe LLC, Pavel Yurevich with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Roberts, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel | ||
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned
Tue 01/16 2:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Roundpipe LLC ; served on 1/5/2018. (epm) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 01/11 2:28 PM
ORDER granting6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles L. Roberts. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/11/2018) (epm) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Thu 01/11 10:46 AM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, by Defendants Chase Roberts, Roundpipe LLC, Pavel Yurevich. (Roberts, Charles) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 01/11 10:41 AM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8913408) filed by Chase Roberts, Roundpipe LLC, Pavel YurevichAttorney Charles Lynn Roberts added to party Chase Roberts(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Lynn Roberts added to party Roundpipe LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Lynn Roberts added to party Pavel Yurevich(pty:dft) (Roberts, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Application for admission Pro Hac Vice | ||
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/05 2:48 PM
Summons Issued as to Chase Roberts, Roundpipe LLC, Pavel Yurevich. (ndt) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office
Fri 01/05 2:45 PM
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ndt) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
Fish
Fri 01/05 2:24 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Fri 01/05 12:42 PM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co. (Pegues, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/05 12:22 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Southwest Airlines Co. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8901311) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Pegues, Michael) |