SBVI WINDDOWN, INC.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-10039
Lead case is: 1:18-bk-10039
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-10040 |
Case Filed: | Jan 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Seaborne Virgin Islands, Inc
World Plaza Building, 9th Floor 268 Munoz Rivera Avenue
San Juan, PR 00918 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago |
Monday, March 21, 2022 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 03/21 1:03 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SH) |
||
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
4
pgs
order
Order
Mon 08/24 9:27 AM
ORDER DISMISSING THE DEBTORS CHAPTER 11 CASES. Signed on 8/21/2020 (DMC) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Withdrawal of Appearance - Notice
Fri 01/31 4:55 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. Daniel W. Sklar has withdrawn from the case. Filed by Saab Defense and Security USA Support and Services Division. (Sklar, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
claims
Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11
Wed 06/27 5:17 PM
Withdrawal of Claim 11, BDO Puerto Rico, PSC., $87,432.45 . Filed by Rust Consulting/Omni Bankruptcy. (Osborne, Brian) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Schedules/Statements
Tue 01/23 9:39 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Seaborne Virgin Islands, Inc. (Mumford, Kerri) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Schedules/Statements
Tue 01/23 9:39 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Seaborne Virgin Islands, Inc. (Mumford, Kerri) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Appearance - Notice
Thu 01/18 9:51 AM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Saab Defense and Security USA Support and Services Division. (Sklar, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order-Joint Admin
Tue 01/09 3:49 PM
An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of SeaStar Holdings, Inc. and its affiliates. The docket in the chapter 11 case of SeaStar Holdings, Inc. Case No. 18-10039 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 1/9/2018 (DMC) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
court
Case Reassigned
Mon 01/08 4:46 PM
Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case. Involvement of Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein Terminated. (AK) |
|
4 | 4
6
pgs
motion
Joint Administration - Motion (Multi)
Mon 01/08 4:15 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by SeaStar Holdings, Inc., Seaborne Puerto Rico, LLC, Seaborne Virgin Islands, Inc. (Mumford, Kerri) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Mon 01/08 4:05 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-10040 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8712011, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
misc
List of Creditors
Mon 01/08 3:59 PM
List of Creditors (Verification of Creditors Matrix) Filed by Seaborne Virgin Islands, Inc. (Landis, Adam) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 01/08 3:57 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Seaborne Virgin Islands, Inc. (Landis, Adam) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Mon 01/08 4:15 PM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case. (AK) |