Jitrade Inc. v. Humming Fashion LK, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John A Kronstadt |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00162 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 07, 2018 2:40 AM PDT |
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Defendant
Humming Fashion LK, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jitrade Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 05/08 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Jitrade Inc.. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Lee, Ginam) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Extension of Time to File
Thu 04/05 9:46 AM
ORDER RE PLAINTIFF JITRADE INC's REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT11 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. It is hereby ordered that: 1. The Request is GRANTED; 2. Plaintiff shall have until May 9, 2018 to effectuate service of a Summons and Complaint as to Defendant Humming Fashion LK, Inc. There will be no further continuances. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 04/03 3:40 PM
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Proof of Service of Summons filed by Plaintiff Jitrade Inc.. (Lee, Ginam) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Ginam Lee, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
30+
pgs
order
Order
Fri 02/16 2:54 PM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES by Judge John A. Kronstadt. See document for details. (lom) |
|
9 | 9
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 02/16 2:04 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt, United States District Judge. The case number will now read: CV 18-00162 JAK (ASx). Because all pleadings are routed using the judge's initials, please be sure to use the initials JAK in place of the initials CBM on all future filings. Judge Kronstadt's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Andrea Keifer, can be reached at 213.894.2156. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pso) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)
Tue 01/16 11:55 AM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-00162 JAK(ASx). (rn) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 01/10 9:22 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Humming Fashion LK, Inc. (jtil) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 01/09 5:47 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 01/08 3:46 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff JITRADE INC., (Lee, Ginam) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 01/08 3:45 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification)3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff JITRADE INC.. (Lee, Ginam) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Mon 01/08 3:44 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by JITRADE INC.. (Lee, Ginam) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 01/08 3:44 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JITRADE INC.. (Lee, Ginam) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 01/08 3:42 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21064252 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff JITRADE INC.. (Attorney Ginam Lee added to party JITRADE INC.(pty:pla))(Lee, Ginam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A", | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "B", | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit "C" |