A'GACI, L.L.C.
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Ronald B King |
Case #: | 5:18-bk-50049 |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 08, 2019 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jul 27, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
A'GACI, L.L.C.
12460 Network Blvd Ste 106
San Antonio, TX 78249-3366 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago |
Thursday, March 12, 2020 | ||
777 | 777
court
Event with PDF (Public)
Thu 03/12 11:18 AM
Court Entry: *CONFIRMATION FROM ATTORNEY TO DESTROY EXHIBITS - RE: DOC #497 (Paez, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Letter - Re: Exhibits | ||
Wednesday, March 11, 2020 | ||
776 | 776
court
Forms (F)
Wed 03/11 4:36 PM
Letter Regarding Return of Exhibits To Ian Peck re: 18-50049 requested (Paez, Daniel) |