Bruneau v. Torrington Board of Education
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Michael P Shea |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00046 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 29:0794 Job Discrimination (Handicap) |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 09, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 08, 2018 4:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
Torrington Board of Education
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Valerie Bruneau
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
notice
Judicial Evaluation Program Survey
Thu 01/10 9:14 AM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Johnson, D.) |
||
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
49 | 49
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 01/09 5:20 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: The parties have reported that this action has been settled in full. Therefore, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Rather than continue to keep the case open on the docket, the Clerk is directed administratively to close the file without prejudice to reopening on or before February 11, 2019. If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal (for approval by the Court or simply for inclusion in the Court's file), they may do so on or before February 11, 2019. The dates set forth in this order may be extended for good cause pursuant to a motion filed in accordance with Local Rule 7. Furthermore, in light of the settlement, the25 motion to dismiss is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/9/2019. (Ram, Megha) |
|
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
48 | 48
misc
Status Report
Tue 01/08 4:26 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Torrington Board of Education. (Zelman, Johanna) |
|
Thursday, January 03, 2019 | ||
47 | 47
order
Order
Thu 01/03 1:42 PM
ORDER: The parties have reported a tentative agreement to settle this case pending only negotiation of the language and approval of the Torrington Board of Education. As the Board was scheduled on meet on December 19, 2018, the parties shall file a joint status report within 5 days of this order indicating the status of the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/3/2019. (Ram, Megha) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
46 | 46
misc
Status Report
Thu 12/13 12:44 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Torrington Board of Education. (Zelman, Johanna) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 11/13 12:14 PM
NOTICE by Torrington Board of Education Notice of Date and Time for Private Mediation (Goldman, Jenna) |
|
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 10/30 1:15 PM
ORDER: The parties have filed a43 joint motion indicating their intent to proceed to private mediation with Judge Elaine Gordon. No later than November 9, 2018, the parties shall provide the Court with the date for the mediation. Within two days after the mediation is held, the parties shall file a joint status report indicating whether they have reached a settlement, or, if further mediation sessions are planned, providing the dates for those sessions. If at any time the parties agree to arbitration or other alternative dispute resolution proceeding, they shall disclose their agreement to the Court and indicate whether such alternative dispute resolution is binding. In light of the parties' intent to proceed to private mediation, the43 joint motion for extension of deadlines is hereby GRANTED. The Court sets the following deadlines: Discovery shall be completed by February 15, 2019. Any dispositive motions shall be filed by March 31, 2019. If a dispositive motion is not filed, a joint trial memorandum shall be filed by May 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/30/2018. (Ram, Megha) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 11/01 8:33 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 2/15/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2019; Joint Trial Brief due by 5/1/2019 (Johnson, D.) |
||
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 10/29 11:28 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until May 1, 2019 varies deadlines including discovery and dispositive motions by Torrington Board of Education. (Zelman, Johanna) |
|
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Wed 10/24 8:41 AM
ORDER. The41 Motion for Protective Order is hereby DENIED without prejudice for failure to follow the Court's discovery protocol. Before filing any motion relating to discovery, the parties are required to comply with the discovery protocol set forth in the12 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/24/2018. (Ram, Megha) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Protective Order
Mon 10/22 5:00 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Torrington Board of Education.Responses due by 11/12/2018(Zelman, Johanna) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G | ||
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 10/10 4:09 PM
ORDER. The39 motion for extension of time is hereby GRANTED. The plaintiff will have until October 24, 2018 to respond to Defendant's Requests for Production and Interrogatories. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/10/2018. (Self, A.) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 09/14 11:51 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time until October 24, 2018 Respond to Defendant's Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Valerie Bruneau. (Feinstein, Andrew) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/07 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Goldman on behalf of Torrington Board of Education (Goldman, Jenna) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 09/06 11:11 AM
ORDER. The36 motion for extension of time is hereby GRANTED. The defendant will have until October 28, 2018 to respond to Plaintiff's interrogatories and requests for production. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/6/2018. (Self, A.) |
|
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 09/05 11:37 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time until October 28, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's interrogatories and requests for production by Torrington Board of Education. (Zelman, Johanna) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 07/18 6:41 PM
REPLY to Response to25 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Torrington Board of Education. (Zelman, Johanna) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order
Thu 07/12 9:45 AM
ORDER. The33 joint motion for modification of scheduling order is hereby GRANTED. The Court sets the following deadlines. The Court is unlikely further to extend these deadlines. 1. Plaintiffs expert reports due: August 15, 2018 2. Deadline to depose Plaintiffs experts: September 15, 20183. Defendants expert reports due: October 15, 20184. Deadline to depose Defendants experts: November 15, 20185. Discovery closes: November 15, 20186. Dispositive motions due: December 31, 20187. If no dispositive motions filed, joint trial memorandum due: February 1, 2019 Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/12/2018. (Self, A.) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 07/13 9:43 AM
Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 11/15/2018; Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2018; Joint Trial Brief due by 2/1/2019 (Johnson, D.) |
||
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 07/11 9:26 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 days Several Deadlines by Torrington Board of Education. (Zelman, Johanna) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
Thu 07/05 10:05 AM
ORDER. The31 motion for extension of time is hereby GRANTED. The defendant will have until July 18, 2018 in which to answer or otherwise respond to the30 opposition to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/5/2018. (Self, A.) |
|
utility
Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/10 11:20 AM
Reset Deadlines as to25 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint . Responses due by 7/18/2018 (Johnson, D.) |
||
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
Tue 07/03 2:09 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition as to25 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint until July 18, 2018 by Torrington Board of Education. (Zelman, Johanna) |
|
30 | 30
28
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Tue 07/03 8:33 AM
Memorandum in Opposition re25 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Valerie Bruneau. (Feinstein, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
Wed 06/20 3:28 PM
ORDER. The28 motion for extension of time is hereby GRANTED. The plaintiff will have until July 3, 2018 to respond to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/20/2018. (Self, A.) |
|
utility
Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 06/21 10:42 AM
Set deadlines as to25 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint . Responses due by 7/3/2018 (Johnson, D.) |
||
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
Tue 06/19 5:10 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to25 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint until July 3, 2018 by Valerie Bruneau. (Feinstein, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order
Wed 06/06 5:29 PM
ORDER. The Court notes that the parties have requested a significant extension of time in a summary manner in their26 joint status report. The Court informs the parties that it will not act upon the parties' request until it is filed in the form of a motion for extension of time demonstrating good cause for such an extension in accordance with Local Rule 7(b). Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/6/2018. (Self, A.) |
|
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
4
pgs
misc
Status Report
Tue 06/05 3:09 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Torrington Board of Education. (Zelman, Johanna) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
3
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Mon 06/04 12:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Torrington Board of Education.Responses due by 6/25/2018(Zelman, Johanna) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law In Support of Renewed Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion to Strike | ||
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 05/30 1:06 PM
ORDER. The22 motion for extension of time is hereby GRANTED. The defendant will have until June 4, 2018 to respond to the plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/30/2018. (Self, A.) |
|
23 | 23
order
Order
Wed 05/30 9:13 AM
ORDER. Since the parties have failed to file a joint status report by the deadline set in the Court's12 scheduling order, the telephonic status conference currently scheduled for June 1, 2018 at 11:30 A.M. is hereby CANCELLED. The parties will have seven (7) days to file a joint status report or face possible sanctions. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/30/2018. (Self, A.) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Thu 05/31 9:23 AM
Answer deadline updated for Torrington Board of Education to 6/4/2018. (Johnson, D.) |
||
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 05/29 3:51 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until June 4, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Amended Complaint20 Amended Complaint by Torrington Board of Education. (Zelman, Johanna) |
|
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 05/15 1:43 PM
ORDER. In light of the20 amended complaint, the18 motion to dismiss is hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/15/2018. (Self, A.) |
|
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 05/14 2:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Torrington Board of Education, filed by Valerie Bruneau.(Feinstein, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Tue 04/24 12:48 PM
ORDER. Defendants have filed a18 motion to dismiss Plaintiffs complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and/or failure to state a claim. On or before May 15, 2018 , Plaintiff shall either file a response to the motion or file an amended complaint in which Plaintiff pleads as many facts as possible, consistent with Rule 11, to address the alleged defects discussed in Defendants' memorandum of law. The Court will not allow further amendments after May 15, 2018 . If Plaintiff chooses to amend and if Defendants renew the motion to dismiss, Defendants may incorporate by reference any prior briefing. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/24/2018. (Self, A.) |
|
utility
Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/24 1:52 PM
Set Deadlines as to18 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim and/or lack of subject matter jurisdiction or in the alternative to strike clain for punitive damages or( Amended Complaint due by 5/15/2018) (Johnson, D.) |
||
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/23 11:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim and/or lack of subject matter jurisdiction or in the alternative to strike clain for punitive damages by Torrington Board of Education.Responses due by 5/14/2018(Van Katwyk, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 27 pgs Memorandum in Support | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/23 11:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Van Katwyk on behalf of Torrington Board of Education (Van Katwyk, Danielle) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 04/06 9:39 AM
ORDER. The15 motion for extension of time is hereby GRANTED. The defendant shall have until April 24, 2018 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/6/2018. (Self, A.) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Mon 04/09 8:42 AM
Answer deadline updated for Torrington Board of Education to 4/24/2018. (Johnson, D.) |
||
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 04/05 11:26 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time until April 24, 2018 To answer or otherwise respond to Complaint by Torrington Board of Education. (Zelman, Johanna) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
5
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/30 4:04 PM
NOTICE by Valerie Bruneau Damages Analysis (Feinstein, Andrew) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/30 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Alan Feinstein on behalf of Valerie Bruneau (Feinstein, Andrew) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
9
pgs
order
Order
Fri 02/09 11:13 AM
ORDER. Having reviewed the parties' Rule 26(f) Report (ECF No. 11), the Court hereby sets forth the deadlines in the attached. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/9/2018. (Self, A.) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings Update Answer Deadline
Tue 02/13 9:21 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings:( Discovery due by 9/15/2018, Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2018, Trial Ready Date 2/15/2019), Answer deadline updated for Torrington Board of Education to 4/9/2018. (Johnson, D.) |
||
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
10
pgs
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Thu 02/08 1:05 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Zelman, Johanna) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
6
pgs
order
Electronic Service Documents
Wed 01/10 4:16 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-representing parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of8 Standing Protective Order,3 Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal filed by Torrington Board of Education,5 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Torrington Board of Education,7 Electronic Filing Order,1 Notice of Removal, filed by Torrington Board of Education,9 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols,4 Compliance with Standing Order in Removed Cases filed by Torrington Board of Education,2 Notice re Notice of Removal, Exhibit A (filed by Torrington Board of Education,6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 01/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Hernandez, T.) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
notice
Notice
Wed 01/10 4:08 PM
Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 01/09/2018.(Hernandez, T.) |
|
Att: 1 discovery attachment | ||
8 | 8
6
pgs
order
Protective Order
Wed 01/10 4:05 PM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 01/09/2018.(Hernandez, T.) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Electronic Filing Order
Wed 01/10 4:04 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 01/09/2018.(Hernandez, T.) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Wed 01/10 4:03 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 04/9/18. Amended Pleadings due by 3/10/2018. Discovery due by 7/11/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 8/10/2018. Signed by Clerk on 01/09/2018.(Hernandez, T.) |
|
5 | 5
2
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/09 5:38 PM
NOTICE by Torrington Board of Education Notice of Pending Motions (Zelman, Johanna) |
|
4 | 4
3
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/09 5:36 PM
NOTICE by Torrington Board of Education Compliance with Standing Order in Removed Cases (Zelman, Johanna) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/09 5:35 PM
NOTICE by Torrington Board of Education Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal (Zelman, Johanna) |
|
2 | 2
26
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/09 5:33 PM
NOTICE by Torrington Board of Education re1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit A (Zelman, Johanna) |
|
1 | 1
4
pgs
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 01/09 5:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Torrington Board of Education from State of Connecticut Judicial District of Litchfield at Torrington, case number LLI-CV-18-6017041. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-4672895, filed by Torrington Board of Education.(Zelman, Johanna) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 01/10 9:53 AM
Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Anastasio, F.) |