Fernimos v. ServiceMaster Residential/Commercial Services, L. P. et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen J Murphy, III |
Referred: | Elizabeth A Stafford |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-10083 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 08, 2018 5:42 AM EDT |
Defendant
SM Clean, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ServiceMaster Residential/Commercial Services, L. P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Fernimos
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order
Tue 06/26 12:44 PM
STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Stipulation and Order
Tue 04/24 11:34 AM
STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Defendants'16 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration and Brief in Support . Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Affidavit
Mon 04/02 12:13 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Glee McAnanly re16 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration and Brief in Support by ServiceMaster Residential/Commercial Services, L. P. (Gray, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement No. 8792, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Franchise Agreement No. 8793, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Franchise Agreement No. 8794, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Franchise Agreement No. 8795, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Letter from ServiceMaster dated 10/19/2015, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Letter from ServiceMaster dated 07/11/2016 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/02 12:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration and Brief in Support by ServiceMaster Residential/Commercial Services, L. P.. (Gray, Michael) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 03/22 9:11 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/19/2018 , Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/19/2018 , Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III , Jury Trial set for 4/23/2019 09:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III . Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar) |
|
minutes
~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Text-Only Order
Thu 03/22 12:27 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Setting Deadline for Defendants to File a Motion to Compel Arbitration or to Transfer, ( Motion due by 4/8/2018 ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar) |
||
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 03/21 3:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/21/2018. (DPar) |
||
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Discovery Plan - Rule 26f
Thu 03/08 2:06 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Kelly, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Appear*
Thu 03/01 12:21 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference Reset for 3/21/2018 02:30 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III . (DPar) |
|
notice
Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled
Thu 03/01 12:20 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 3/14/2018 is Cancelled re12 Set Deadlines/Hearings. (DPar) |
||
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 02/21 2:02 PM
ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, ( Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2018 02:30 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar) |
|
11 | 11
respoth
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 02/21 12:07 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Mary Fernimos. (Stempien, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Contract, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Mary Fernimos | ||
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Show Cause
Mon 02/12 3:15 PM
ORDER for Mary Fernimos to Show Cause why case should not be dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, ( Show Cause Response due by 2/22/2018 ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Fri 02/09 1:50 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Kelly, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 02/07 4:12 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Kelly, Douglas) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Appearance
Fri 01/26 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas R. Kelly on behalf of All Defendants. (Kelly, Douglas) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Appearance
Fri 01/26 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Gray on behalf of SM Clean, LLC, ServiceMaster Residential/Commercial Services, L. P.. (Gray, Michael) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed
Fri 01/19 1:16 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. ServiceMaster Residential/Commercial Services, L. P. served on 1/17/2018, answer due 2/7/2018. (Stempien, Eric) |
|
4 | 4
service
Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed
Fri 01/19 1:15 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. SM Clean, LLC served on 1/17/2018, answer due 2/7/2018. (Stempien, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued*
Wed 01/10 3:14 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *SM Clean, LLC* (LGra) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued*
Wed 01/10 3:14 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *ServiceMaster Residential/Commercial Services, L. P.* (LGra) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Tue 01/09 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Mary Fernimos against SM Clean, LLC, ServiceMaster Residential/Commercial Services, L. P. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6545632 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Stempien, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit |