Booker-Bey v. Roberson et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nannette A Baker |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00042 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 06, 2018 |
Defendant
Ms. Roberson
|
|
Defendant
St. Louis County Dept. of Justice
|
|
Plaintiff
Terrance Darnell Booker-Bey
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter re:Frap
Wed 06/06 5:13 PM
Letter from Clerk sent to pro-se prisoner re:FRAP - all procedures for filing Notice of Appeal (copy of motion to proceed IFP on appeal attached and mailed) (KJS) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
Wed 06/06 5:07 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent plaintiff is seeking any state law claims in this action, those claims are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c). IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/6/18. (KJS) |
|
7 | 7
4
pgs
order
Opinion Memorandum
Wed 06/06 5:06 PM
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff is not required to pay a filing fee at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent plaintiff is seeking any state law claims in this action, those claims are dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c). An Order of Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/6/18. (KJS) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 06/06 5:13 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 7-9. Wed Jun 6 17:13:51 CDT 2018 (Shirley, Kelley) |
||
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT)
Mon 06/04 9:45 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL re1 DCM Complaint, by Plaintiff Terrance Darnell Booker-Bey. (AAS) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08
Tue 01/09 6:38 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) |
|
misc
Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Tue 01/09 12:33 PM
***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DJO) |
||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Tue 01/09 12:34 PM
Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (DJO) |
||
misc
Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Tue 01/09 1:01 PM
***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Jan 9 13:01:37 CST 2018 (admin,) |
||
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certified Inmate Account Statement
Tue 01/09 12:32 PM
Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Terrance Darnell Booker-Bey. (DJO) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 01/09 12:31 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Terrance Darnell Booker-Bey. (DJO) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case - 42:1983)
Tue 01/09 12:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Terrance Darnell Booker-Bey. (DJO) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
DCM Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)
Tue 01/09 12:28 PM
DCM COMPLAINT against defendant Ms. Roberson, St. Louis County Dept. of Justice Jury Demand,, filed by Terrance Darnell Booker-Bey.(DJO) |
|
Att: 1 Inmate Handbook, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 4 Correspondence, | ||
Att: 5 Judge Assignment Label, | ||
Att: 6 Envelope |