ALO, LLC v. Dana Falsetti, et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00208 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 08, 2018 2:06 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Dana Falsetti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALO, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
58 | 58
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 04/13 11:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court is in receipt of the parties Joint Stipulation of Dismissal57 filed April 12, 2018. No Proposed Order was provided. The Court hereby grants the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of the entire case with prejudice. Parties shall bear their owncosts and attorneys fees.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) |
|
57 | 57
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 04/12 2:28 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to settlement filed by plaintiff ALO, LLC.(Holland, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
56 | 56
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/11 3:43 PM
ORDER APPROVING55 STIPULATION WITHDRAWING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT44 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc) |
|
55 | 55
stip
Withdraw Motion/Application/Request/Ex Parte Application
Wed 04/11 10:08 AM
STIPULATION to Withdraw Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Rule 56(a) Motion 44 filed by Plaintiff ALO, LLC.(Holland, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
54 | 54
order
For Order
Tue 04/10 9:53 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ALO, LLCS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR MOTION TO EXTEND HEARING DATE FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT51 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment44 is continued to June 25, 2018 10:00 A.M. (lc) |
|
53 | 53
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 04/09 3:45 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by U.S. Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Effective, April 12, 2018, Judge Kim will be located at the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, COURTROOM 540 on the 5th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 540 of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse. Magistrate Judge Kim's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Connie Lee, may be reached at (213) 894-4436. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
52 | 52
misc
Declaration
Thu 04/05 4:49 PM
DECLARATION of MISASHA S. GRAHAM re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for MOVE HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 51 filed by Plaintiff ALO, LLC. (Holland, Andrew) |
|
51 | 51
12
pgs
motion
Order
Thu 04/05 4:47 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for MOVE HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff ALO, LLC. (Holland, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |