HEARD v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael A Shipp |
Referred: | Rukhsanah L Singh |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00430 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 10, 2018 5:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC
|
|
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL
|
Represented By
|
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
|
|
Plaintiff
SANDRA HEARD
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Substitution of Attorney
Wed 03/27 3:54 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney THOMAS T. LOCKE terminated. Attorney SUZANNE I. TURPIN for PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL added.. (TURPIN, SUZANNE) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2023 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 02/22 7:10 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman and Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson no longer assigned to case. (cm, ) |
||
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
30+
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/12 10:01 AM
ORDER that each of the Pre-CMO Cases identified in Exhibit A are DISMISSED, without prejudice, as to Defendant PCPC only. In the event a dismissal is inadvertently entered in a case not subject to dismissal for the reasons stated above, this will constitute grounds for the effected plaintiff to reinstate his or her action against PCPC, and the statute of limitations in such a case would be tolled from the date of the entry of dismissal until the date of reinstatement. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/11/2018.(km) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/12 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. SILVER on behalf of IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC (SILVER, MARK) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/28 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/28 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/28 10:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (SHARKO, SUSAN) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/27 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (TERSIGNI, JULIE) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/30 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS T. LOCKE on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (LOCKE, THOMAS) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/12 10:52 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC, PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *SHANNON BARLOW* (sab) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 01/12 10:04 AM
Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (sab) |
||
mdl
MDL Direct File
Fri 01/12 10:53 AM
Member Case Direct File on 1/11/2018, for MDL 16-2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (sab) |
||
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/11 12:44 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8390338) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SANDRA HEARD.(LOPALO, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Information Sheet |