REBOLLEDO-ESTUPINAN v. KUTA
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Kim R Gibson |
Referred: | Keith A Pesto |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00007 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2018 |
Re-opened: | Jan 24, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Thu 02/28 4:25 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kim R. Gibson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/28/2019. And as more fully stated in said memo. (Court Reporter: Curt Rose) (cel) |
|
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 09/27 1:53 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER - it is Ordered that the petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus is dismissed in part as moot and denied in part;7 Report and Recommendation is adopted as the opinion of the Court. The Clerk shall mark this matter closed, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 9/27/2018. (dlg) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Report and Recommendation
Wed 07/18 8:39 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by SALOMON REBOLLEDO-ESTUPINAN, recommending that the petition should be dismissed in part as moot and denied in part; Objections to R&R due by 8/1/2018 Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 8/6/2018 Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 7/18/2018. (plp) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents
Mon 07/16 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Suggestion of Mootness by S. M. KUTA re1 Remark (Ivory, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1a, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1b, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1c, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 1d, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 1e, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 1f, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 1g | ||
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/04 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ivory on behalf of S. M. KUTA. (Ivory, Michael) |
|
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Habeas Corpus Service
Fri 05/04 9:44 AM
ORDER DIRECTING that the U.S. Marshal shall make service of the petition and this Rule and Order on the respondent, the Attorney General and the United States Attorney for the Western District of Pennsylania, costs to be advanced by the petitioner. If the petitioner cannot afford the cost of service he shall file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Within sixty days of service of this Rule and Order, respondent, through the United States Attorney for the Western District of Pennsylvania, shall file a response to the allegations of the petition for writ of habeas corpus showing cause, if any, why the writ should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 5/3/2018. (plp) |
|
utility
Remark
Fri 05/04 9:45 AM
Forwarded to U.S. Marshal certified copies of order dated 5/3/2018 and signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto along with copies of petition and docket sheet for service. This is a text-only entry, no PDF document will issue. (plp) |
||
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (for Clerk of Court personnel only)
Wed 01/24 3:42 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 34668004296), filed by SALOMON REBOLLEDO-ESTUPINAN. (plp) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Receipt | ||
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
order
Statistical Case Closing
Fri 01/12 9:55 AM
ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING; the Clerk shall mark this matter administratively closed until arrangements are made for the payment of the filing fee and shall re-open the matter upon receipt of the filing fee or a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 1/12/2018. (plp) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
utility
Remark
Thu 01/11 1:56 PM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus without filing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis received. (plp) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |