Intercontinental Great Brands LLC v. Tinted Brew, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Patrick J Walsh |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00257 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:44 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 11, 2018 2:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
Jonathan Nemr
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tinted Brew, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Intercontinental Great Brands LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Mon 05/14 1:33 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (lc) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 05/14 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Intercontinental Great Brands LLC. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Ybarra, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Thu 04/26 12:05 PM
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT30 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The Court, having considered the parties' Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (dkt. 30), HEREBY ORDERS: The due date for Defendants' responses to the complaint (dkt. 2) is set to May 14, 2018. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
stip
Continue
Wed 04/25 3:09 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to Respond to Complaint from April 30, 2018 to May 14, 2018 Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),2 filed by Defendants Jonathan Nemr, Tinted Brew, Inc..(Donaldson, Corey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Wed 03/28 2:06 PM
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT TO APRIL 30, 201827 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) |
|
28 | 28
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 03/28 11:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) |
|
27 | 27
stip
Continue
Wed 03/28 10:50 AM
STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to Respond to Complaint from April 2, 2018 to April 30, 2018 Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),2 filed by Defendants Jonathan Nemr, Tinted Brew, Inc..(Donaldson, Corey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 16-05 (CV-52)
Tue 03/20 3:16 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:18-cv-00257 ODW(PJWx). (rn) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Thu 03/08 1:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT24 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The Court HEREBY ORDERS: The due date for Defendants' responses to the complaint (dkt. 2) is set to April 2, 2018. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
5
pgs
stip
Order
Tue 03/06 6:56 PM
STIPULATION for Order Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendants Jonathan Nemr, Tinted Brew, Inc..(Donaldson, Corey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 02/01 10:10 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Wed 01/31 4:23 PM
ORDER SETTING COMPLAINT RESPONSE DUE DATE FOR DEFENDANTS TO 3/12/201821 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
5
pgs
stip
Order
Mon 01/29 6:51 PM
STIPULATION for Order to Set Complaint Response Due Date for Defendants filed by Defendants Jonathan Nemr, Tinted Brew, Inc..(Attorney Corey Alexander Donaldson added to party Jonathan Nemr(pty:dft), Attorney Corey Alexander Donaldson added to party Tinted Brew, Inc.(pty:dft))(Donaldson, Corey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 01/24 9:58 AM
ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jason D. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Intercontinental Great Brands, LLC, designating Joseph J. Ybarra as local counsel17 . (iv) |
|
19 | 19
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 01/24 9:56 AM
ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jessica Vosgerchian to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Intercontinental Great Brands, LLC, designating Joseph J. Ybarra as local counsel16 . (iv) |
|
18 | 18
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 01/24 9:47 AM
ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Barbara A. Solomon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Intercontinental Great Brands, LLC, designating Joseph J. Ybarra as local counsel15 . (iv) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 01/22 11:13 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jason D. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Intercontinental Great Brands LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21132999) filed by Plaintiff Intercontinental Great Brands LLC . (Ybarra, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 01/22 11:10 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jessica A. Vosgerchian to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Intercontinental Great Brands LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21132956) filed by Plaintiff Intercontinental Great Br ands LLC. (Ybarra, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 01/22 11:07 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Barbara A. Solomon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Intercontinental Great Brands LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21132713) filed by Plaintiff Intercontinental Great Brands LLC. (Ybarra, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Tue 01/16 9:27 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jessica Vosgerchain. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) |
|
13 | 13
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Tue 01/16 9:26 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jason D Jones. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) |
|
12 | 12
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Tue 01/16 9:25 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Barbara A Solomon. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 01/16 9:22 AM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint2 as to defendant Jonathan Nemr. (esa) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 01/16 9:21 AM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint2 as to defendant Tinted Brew, Inc. (esa) |
|
9 | 9
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 01/16 9:16 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 01/16 9:15 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (esa) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Fri 01/12 12:37 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Intercontinental Great Brands LLC. (Huang, Katherine) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 01/12 12:36 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Intercontinental Great Brands LLC, identifying Intercontinental Brands LLC; Mondelez Global LLC; Mondelez International, Inc.. (Huang, Katherine) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Fri 01/12 12:34 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),2 filed by Plaintiff Intercontinental Great Brands LLC. (Huang, Katherine) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 01/12 12:32 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),2 filed by Plaintiff Intercontinental Great Brands LLC. (Huang, Katherine) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 01/12 12:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Intercontinental Great Brands LLC. (Huang, Katherine) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 01/12 12:28 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21093269 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Intercontinental Great Brands LLC. (Attorney Katherine Kai-yi Huang added to party Intercontinental Great Brands LLC(pty:pla))(Huang, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D | ||
1 | 1
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Fri 01/12 10:25 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. (esa) |