|
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 05/07 10:34 AM
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 05/04 7:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Theresa Brooke (Strojnik, Peter) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/09 4:48 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Theresa Brooke.. (Strojnik, Peter) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 04/09 10:54 AM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING: Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/23/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/15 10:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Hotel Investment Group, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 03/13 7:23 PM
Proposed Summons. (Strojnik, Peter) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 03/13 7:22 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Against New Defendant Hotel Investment Group, Inc. against All Defendants. Filed byTheresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 02/05 4:09 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/20/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. The Court sets the Initial Case Management Conference for 6/27/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement including Defendant's consent or declination due by 6/20/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/16 2:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Wiiliam Matusich. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
Tue 01/16 2:20 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 01/16 9:42 AM
Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/30/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 01/12 11:20 PM
Proposed Summons. (Strojnik, Peter) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/12 11:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Joe H. Caputo Testamentary Trust ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12023583.). Filed byTheresa Brooke.(Strojnik, Peter) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|