Eline et al v. Town of Ocean City Maryland et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | James K Bredar |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00145 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983vp Violation of Due Process and Equal Protection |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 15, 2018 5:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
Town of Ocean City Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Megan A Bryant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christine E Coleman, MD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chelsea C Eline, MD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rose R MacGregor, MD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela A Urban, MD
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Richard W Meehan
Terminated: 05/24/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joseph J Theobald
Terminated: 05/24/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ross C Buzzuro
Terminated: 05/24/2018
|
Represented By
|
1. | Five women file lawsuit over ordinance barring toplessness on Ocean City beaches (triblive.com) |
Submitted Fri 01/19/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, September 10, 2021 | ||
81 | 81
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 09/10 3:26 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to75 Notice of Appeal filed by Angela A Urban, Chelsea C Eline, Christine E Coleman, Rose R MacGregor, Megan A Bryant (slss, Deputy Clerk) |