SASSAMAN v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Claire C Cecchi |
Referred: | Leda D Wettre |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00626 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 15, 2018 5:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
ASTRAZENECA LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TAP PHARMACEUTICALS PRODUCTS, INC.
|
|
In Re
PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.II)
|
|
Plaintiff
JODY SASSAMAN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 28, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation
Tue 02/28 1:25 PM
STIPULATION of Stay of Case Management Order 74 by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP. (HINDY, GREGORY) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 01/30 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER ANDREW ROJAO on behalf of ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP (ROJAO, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 01/23 4:52 PM
NOTICE by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP of Appearance for Jeffrey Hines, Esq. (HINDY, GREGORY) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 01/12 2:53 PM
NOTICE by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP of Appearance for Jhanelle A. Graham Caldwell, Esq. (HINDY, GREGORY) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Substitution of Attorney
Tue 12/13 11:57 AM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney LESLIE A BENITEZ terminated. Attorney BETH S. ROSE for TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC.,BETH S. ROSE for TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED,BETH S. ROSE for TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.,BETH S. ROSE for TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. added.. (ROSE, BETH) |
|
Monday, September 12, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 09/12 2:25 PM
NOTICE by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP of Appearance for Kathryn Podsiadlo, Esq. (HINDY, GREGORY) |
|
Friday, August 19, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Fri 08/19 5:15 PM
STIPULATION OF STAY OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 74 by TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.. (KING, NICOLE) |
|
qc
QC - Document Filed in Incorrect Case
Fri 08/19 5:52 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The14 Stipulation filed by N. KING on 8/19/2022 appears to be filed in the incorrect case. Please review the Stipulation and file it in the correct case. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam) |
||
Tuesday, August 16, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/16 6:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLE N KING on behalf of TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. (KING, NICOLE) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/21 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES WILLIAM MIZGALA on behalf of TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. (MIZGALA, JAMES) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/21 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREA MARIE GLINKA PRZYBYSZ on behalf of TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. (GLINKA PRZYBYSZ, ANDREA) |
|
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 10/08 4:33 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Magistrate Judge Mark Falk no longer assigned to the case. (mxw, ) |
||
Thursday, September 16, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Substitution of Attorney
Thu 09/16 11:32 AM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JEFFREY R. LILLY terminated. Attorney LESLIE A BENITEZ for TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC.,LESLIE A BENITEZ for TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED,LESLIE A BENITEZ for TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.,LESLIE A BENITEZ for TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. added.. (BENITEZ, LESLIE) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 10/11 12:44 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO NAMED DEFENDANTS ONLY. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/11/18. (gh, ) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/17 3:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JODY SASSAMAN. TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC. served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018; TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018; TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018. (FINKEN, TRACY) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/08 2:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JODY SASSAMAN. TAP PHARMACEUTICALS PRODUCTS, INC. served on 4/19/2018, answer due 5/10/2018. (FINKEN, TRACY) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/01 3:58 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC.(LILLY, JEFFREY) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/25 4:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JODY SASSAMAN. TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. served on 4/16/2018, answer due 5/7/2018; TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC. served on 4/16/2018, answer due 5/7/2018; TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. served on 4/16/2018, answer due 5/7/2018; TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. served on 4/16/2018, answer due 5/7/2018. (FINKEN, TRACY) |
|
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/20 5:09 PM
Short-Form ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND with Certificate of Service by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP.(HINDY, GREGORY) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 04/04 3:00 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JODY SASSAMAN. ASTRAZENECA LP waiver sent on 3/27/2018, answer due 5/28/2018; ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP waiver sent on 3/27/2018, answer due 5/28/2018. (FINKEN, TRACY) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/16 1:43 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TAP PHARMACEUTICALS PRODUCTS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Gail A. Hansen* (gh, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/16 12:59 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8398779) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JODY SASSAMAN.(FINKEN, TRACY) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 01/16 1:43 PM
Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk added. (gh, ) |
||
order
Case Management Order
Tue 01/16 1:44 PM
For all Case Management Orders[LINK:click here] (gh, ) |
||
mdl
MDL Direct File
Tue 01/16 1:45 PM
Member Case Direct File on 1/16/18, for MDL 2789 PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.II) (gh, ) |