Camacho v. Bed Bath and Beyond, Inc.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William F Kuntz, II |
Referred: | Ramon E Reyes, Jr |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00279 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 15, 2018 4:22 AM EDT |
Defendant
Bed Bath and Beyond, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Camacho
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 06/20 11:09 AM
STIPULATION Of Voluntary Dismissal: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff and Defendant, by and through their undersigned counsel, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, that this action is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice, without costs or attorneys' fees. Application granted. SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 6/19/2018. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 06/19 3:35 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Bed Bath and Beyond, Inc. (Schwarz, Douglas) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 06/08 11:27 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Bed Bath and Beyond, Inc. (Schwarz, Douglas) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 05/11 10:11 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by 6/8/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 5/11/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 05/10 6:21 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by Bed Bath and Beyond, Inc.. (Schwarz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 04/10 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Settlement & by Jason Camacho (Cohen, Daniel) Modified on 4/10/2018 (Vertus, Miriam) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 04/10 11:18 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The 4/19/2018 Initial Conference is cancelled. The parties are directed to file a Stipulation of Dismissal or Status Report on or before 5/10/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 4/10/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 03/15 9:16 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. All counsel are required to attend, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel are aware of their obligation to appear. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 4/16/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/15/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 03/15 9:10 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Defendant Bed Bath and Beyond, Inc., Extension of Time to Answer by 4/16/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/15/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 03/14 3:46 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Bed Bath and Beyond, Inc.. (Schwarz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 02/13 10:52 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Bed Bath and Beyond, Inc., answer is due 3/15/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 2/13/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 02/12 2:58 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, to March 15, 2018 by Bed Bath and Beyond, Inc.. (Schwarz, Douglas) |
|
Sunday, February 11, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Sun 02/11 6:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Camacho. Bed Bath and Beyond, Inc. served on 1/23/2018, answer due 2/13/2018. (Cohen, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 01/18 3:02 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 01/18 3:01 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/18 3:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Bed Bath and Beyond, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/16 1:47 PM
COMPLAINT against Bed Bath and Beyond, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10117853 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Jason Camacho. (Cohen, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 01/18 3:00 PM
Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |