Vanguard Graphics LLC v. Total Press Sales & Service, LLC
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Norman A Mordue |
Referred: | Miroslav Lovric |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00055 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 21, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 11, 2018 4:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
Total Press Sales & Service, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vanguard Graphics LLC
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Britton Services, Inc.
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
KML Carriers, LLC
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Trans American Trucking Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
True North Express, Inc.
|
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Total Press Sales & Service, LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
ThirdParty Defendant
Blue Hawk Carrier, Inc.
Terminated: 06/29/2018
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |