Alkhamaisi et al v. Katmai Health Servces, LLC et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William Q Hayes |
Referred: | Bernard G Skomal |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00115 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:0201fl FLSA: Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA) |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 17, 2018 1:56 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1 through 25
|
|
Defendant
Katmai Government Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Katmai Health Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raof Alkhamaisi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Salah Salea
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
10
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion for Settlement
Tue 08/13 11:38 AM
ORDER Granting38 Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plaintiff's36 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, Settlement Administrator Costs, and Enhancement Awards. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/9/2019. (ag) |
|
39 | 39
minutes
Fairness Hearing Final Approval Hearing ~Util - Motions Submitted
Fri 08/09 9:49 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Q. Hayes: Fairness Hearing and Final Approval Hearing held on 8/9/2019. Oral discussion heard on Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (ECF No.38 ). The Court will issue a written decision. (Court Reporter/ECR Melinda Setterman). (Plaintiff Attorney Alexei Kuchinsky).(Defendant Attorney David Andrew Quigley; Roland Juarez). (no document attached) (ajs) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Settlement
Fri 07/12 5:05 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement of Class and Collective by Raof Alkhamaisi, Salah Salea.(Kuchinsky, Alexei) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration DECLARATION OF WILLIAM KLEIN IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration DECLARATION OF RAOF ALKHAMAISI IN SUPPORT OF ENHANCEMENT AWARDS, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration DECLARATION OF SALAH SALEA IN SUPPORT OF ENHANCEMENT AWARDS | ||
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Declaration
Thu 07/11 10:13 AM
DECLARATION re35 Order on Motion for Settlement Settlement Administrator Declaration by Plaintiffs Raof Alkhamaisi, Salah Salea.(Kuchinsky, Alexei) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" | ||
Monday, June 10, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Attorney Fees
Mon 06/10 6:20 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Raof Alkhamaisi, Salah Salea.(Kuchinsky, Alexei) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Alexei Kuchinsky, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Trey Dayes | ||
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
14
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Thu 03/28 2:03 PM
ORDER Granting33 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/28/2019. (ag) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Supplemental Document
Mon 02/25 12:36 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Raof Alkhamaisi, Salah Salea re33 Joint MOTION for Settlement of Class and Collective Supplemental Declaration with Signed Settlement . (Kuchinsky, Alexei) |
|
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Settlement
Mon 02/04 6:22 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement of Class and Collective by Raof Alkhamaisi, Salah Salea.(Kuchinsky, Alexei) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration DECLARATION OF ALEXEI KUCHINSKY IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration ATTORNEY TREY DAYES DECLARATION IS SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT | ||
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 01/08 12:44 PM
ORDER: (1) Setting Deadline for Filing Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement and (2) Vacating January 9, 2019 Telephonic Status Conference. The parties shall file a joint motion for preliminary approval of class and collective action settlement before Judge Hayes by 02/04/2019. The telephonic Status Conference set before Judge Skomal on 01/09/2019 is Vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 01/08/2019.(ajs) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 12/21 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Settlement UPDATED by Raof Alkhamaisi, Salah Salea (Kuchinsky, Alexei) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Minute Order (No Time)
Fri 12/14 10:22 AM
Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal re29 Notice of Settlement: On December 11, 2018 the parties filed a Joint Notice of Settlement (ECF No. 29) in which they state the case has been settled and they are "preparing a motion for preliminary approval" of the class and collective action settlement. The parties are to file an updated Notice of Settlement no later than Friday, December 21, 2018 in which they specify how much time is required for filing such a motion. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on December 14, 2018.(ad1) |
|
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 12/11 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Raof Alkhamaisi, Salah Salea (Kuchinsky, Alexei) |
|
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Wed 11/07 2:38 PM
ORDER Granting27 Joint Motion to Extend Class Certification Deadline. Plaintiffs' motion(s) for class certification and for conditional certification of collective action under the Fair Labor Standards Act must be filed on or before 12/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 11/07/2018. (ajs) |
|
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Continue
Fri 11/02 11:02 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue Class Certification Deadline per Stipulation by Raof Alkhamaisi.(Kuchinsky, Alexei) QC mailer sent re: proposed order should not be attached (ajs) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement | ||
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 09/07 10:28 AM
ORDER Granting in Part18 Joint Motion to Extend Discovery and Pre-Trial Proceedings Deadlines and Setting Forth Amended Scheduling Order. Telephonic attorneys-only Status Conference reset for 1/9/2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 09/06/2018. (ajs) |
|
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Wed 08/29 4:20 PM
RESPONSE in Support re18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Class Certification Motion Supplemental Joint Statement filed by Raof Alkhamaisi, Salah Salea. (Kuchinsky, Alexei) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
10
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Tue 08/28 10:38 AM
ORDER Granting20 Amended Joint Motion to Enter Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 08/27/2018. (ajs) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Minute Order (No Time)
Mon 08/27 5:13 PM
Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Upon review of the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (ECF No. 18), the parties are ORDERED to file a supplemental Joint Statement setting forth the specific discovery relating to class certification that remains outstanding. They are to do so NO LATER THAN Thursday, August 30, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on August 27, 2018.(ad1) |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/23 7:08 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA (FRCP 45(a)(4)) by Raof Alkhamaisi, Salah Salea(Dayes, Alberte) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena - United States Department of the Navy | ||
21 | 21
3
pgs
misc
Withdrawal of Document
Thu 08/23 7:07 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Raof Alkhamaisi, Salah Salea re19 Notice (Other), filed by Raof Alkhamaisi, Salah Salea . (Dayes, Alberte) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
13
pgs
motion
Protective Order
Wed 08/22 1:28 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Amended) by Katmai Government Services, LLC, Katmai Health Services, LLC. (Quigley, David) (ajs) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/22 7:49 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA (FRCP 45(a)(4)) by Raof Alkhamaisi, Salah Salea(Dayes, Alberte) QC mailer sent re: PDF in fillable format. Atty to withdraw and refile (ajs) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena - United States Department of the Navy | ||
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Extension of Time to File
Tue 08/21 7:07 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Class Certification Motion by Raof Alkhamaisi, Salah Salea.(Kuchinsky, Alexei) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Kuchinsky | ||
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Mon 07/30 3:53 PM
ORDER Denying16 Joint Motion to Enter Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 07/30/2018. (ajs) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Protective Order
Tue 07/24 4:22 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Katmai Government Services, LLC, Katmai Health Services, LLC. (Quigley, David) |
|
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 04/12 12:07 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings: Case Management Conference was held on 04/11/2018. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/3/2018 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 04/12/2018.(ajs) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
minutes
Case Management Conference Early Neutral Evaluation Conference
Wed 04/11 2:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Judge Skomal held an Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference on April 11, 2018. The case did not settle. Court to issue a Scheduling Order. (Plaintiff Attorney Alberte Dayes; Alexei Kuchinsky; Bill Klein). (Defendant Attorney David Andrew Quigley; Roland M. Juarez). (no document attached) (ad1) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Change of Hearing
Tue 04/03 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Change of Hearing: Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, the telephonic, attorney's only Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for April 11, 2018 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal has been RESCHEDULED TO April 11, 2018 at 10:00 AM. Plaintiff's counsel remains responsible for coordinating and initiating the JOINT call to the Court at(619) 557-2993 on April 11, 2018 at 10:00 AM. (no document attached) (ad1) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Change of Hearing
Mon 04/02 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Change of Hearing: Upon careful review of the parties' Confidential Early Neutral Evaluation Statements, the Court hereby CONVERTS the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for April 11, 2018 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal into a TELEPHONIC, ATTORNEYS ONLY conference. Accordingly, Plaintiff's counsel is ORDERED to coordinate and initiate a JOINT call to the Court at (619) 557-2993 on April 11, 2018 at 1:30 PM PST. If the parties JOINTLY wish for the Early Neutral Evaluation to remain in-person, they must JOINTLY call into chambers no later than the close of business on Monday, April 9, 2018. (no document attached) (ad1) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Joint Discovery Plan
Tue 03/27 11:32 AM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Raof Alkhamaisi(Kuchinsky, Alexei) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | ||
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Wed 03/07 3:24 PM
ORDER Granting9 Joint Motion to Extend Certain Initial Case Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 03/07/2018. (ajs) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Continue
Tue 03/06 4:35 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Certain Initial Deadlines by Katmai Government Services, LLC, Katmai Health Services, LLC. (Juarez, Roland)Attorney Roland M. Juarez added to party Katmai Government Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Roland M. Juarez added to party Katmai Health Services, LLC(pty:dft) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Declaration
Tue 02/20 5:36 PM
DECLARATION re7 Notice of Party With Financial Interest CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Raof Alkhamaisi, Salah Salea. (Kuchinsky, Alexei) |
|
Monday, February 19, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Mon 02/19 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Raof Alkhamaisi, Salah Salea (Kuchinsky, Alexei) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order re Pro Hac Vice Application
Wed 01/31 2:39 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Alberte Dayes, re5 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/30/2018.(kcm) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 01/26 2:31 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10853195.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Dayes, Alberte) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
6
pgs
order
Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
Thu 01/25 4:02 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 4/11/2018 at 01:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Joint Discovery Plan due 3/28/2018. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE, a Case Management Conference will be held at the conclusion of the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 01/25/2018.(ajs) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Thu 01/18 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Katmai Government Services, LLC; Katmai Health Services, LLC. Identifying Corporate Parent Ouzinkie Native Corporation for Katmai Government Services, LLC. (rmc) |
|
2 | 2
respoth
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Thu 01/18 3:03 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Katmai Government Services, LLC; Katmai Health Services, LLC. (rmc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 01/18 3:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-02017 00048476-CU-OE-CTL. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-10823598), filed by Katmai Government Services, LLC; Katmai Health Services, LLC. The new case number is 3:18-cv-115-WQH-BGS. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(rmc) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration Cindy M. Vanden Berg, | ||
Att: 5 Proof of Service |