Ghislaine Paul v. Noubar Didizian, et al
Original Case: 1:12-cv-01196
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:13-cvpri-07132 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 30, 2013 |
Terminated: | Feb 07, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 10, 2016 9:07 PM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Noubar A. Didizian
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Government of the District of Columbia Office of Risk Management Disability Compensation Program
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Ghislaine Paul
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/10/2016 9:07 PM EST |
Friday, August 30, 2013 | ||
PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. 13-7132 | ||
NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1454325] by Ghislaine Paul seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:12-cv-01196-CKK. Assigned USCA Case Number 13-7132 | ||
CLERK'S ORDER filed [1454327] holding case in abeyance . Case 13-7132 held in abeyance pending decision in 1:12cv1196 CKK from U.S. District Court; The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order to the district court. 13-7132 |