Lone Star Tangible Assets, LP et al v. PM Web Assets, LLC et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert Pitman |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00047 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1121 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 11, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 18, 2018 3:57 AM CDT |
Defendant
PM Web Assets, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Texas Precious Metals, LLC, TX
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lone Star Tangible Assets, LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USGB, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120)
Fri 08/03 11:24 AM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (dl) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 06/11 4:21 PM
ORDER GRANTING24 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Dismiss
Thu 06/07 3:44 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss All Claims by Texas Precious Metals, LLC.(Taaffe, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order Cancelling Deadline
Thu 05/03 8:09 AM
ORDER Cancelling Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) |
|
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 05/02 6:09 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Lone Star Tangible Assets, LP, USGB, LLC (Dunham, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 04/18 10:44 AM
ORDER, (Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice
Mon 04/16 2:47 PM
NOTICE Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by Lone Star Tangible Assets, LP, USGB, LLC (Vahl, Hannah) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Mon 04/16 2:31 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Scheduling Order by Lone Star Tangible Assets, LP, USGB, LLC.(Vahl, Hannah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 04/09 8:51 PM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint by Texas Precious Metals, LLC.(Taaffe, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Wed 03/28 5:24 PM
PM Web Assets, LLC's ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint by PM Web Assets, LLC.(Chavez, Hector) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 03/28 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hector Raul Chavez, III on behalf of PM Web Assets, LLC. Attorney Hector Raul Chavez, III added to party PM Web Assets, LLC(pty:dft) (Chavez, Hector) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 03/07 8:44 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants amending, filed by Lone Star Tangible Assets, LP, USGB, LLC.(Dunham, David) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/07 8:23 AM
ORDER GRANTING13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony G. Buzbee. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/06 12:07 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter K. Taaffe for Admission of Anthony G. Buzbee ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10533001) by on behalf of Texas Precious Metals, LLC.(Taaffe, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 03/02 5:20 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Hannah M. Vahl (Vahl, Hannah) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 03/02 5:15 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by David E. Dunham (Dunham, David) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter/Correspondence
Thu 02/22 8:10 AM
Letter to Anthony G. Buzbee re: non-admission status. (td) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 02/15 4:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint . Attorney Lee Landa Kaplan added to party PM Web Assets, LLC(pty:dft) by PM Web Assets, LLC.(Kaplan, Lee) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 02/15 4:02 PM
Defendant Texas Precious Metals, LLC's ANSWER to1 Complaint . Attorney Peter K. Taaffe added to party Texas Precious Metals, LLC(pty:dft) by Texas Precious Metals, LLC.(Taaffe, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 02/14 10:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lone Star Tangible Assets, LP, USGB, LLC. Texas Precious Metals, LLC served on 1/26/2018, answer due 2/16/2018. (Dunham, David) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 02/14 10:51 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lone Star Tangible Assets, LP, USGB, LLC. PM Web Assets, LLC served on 1/26/2018, answer due 2/16/2018. (Dunham, David) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/22 12:11 PM
Summons Issued as to PM Web Assets, LLC, Texas Precious Metals, LLC. (cj) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/22 10:23 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lone Star Tangible Assets, LP, USGB, LLC. (Dunham, David) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/22 10:22 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lone Star Tangible Assets, LP, USGB, LLC. (Dunham, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Letter/Correspondence
Mon 01/22 10:22 AM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with copy of complaint.. (cj) (Main Document 2 replaced to include copy of blank Patent/Trademark form on 1/22/2018) (cj) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/19 5:24 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-10374850). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Lone Star Tangible Assets, LP, USGB, LLC.(Dunham, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 01/22 9:49 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Mon 01/22 9:50 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lone Star Tangible Assets, LP, USGB, LLC. (cj) |