MacCorquodale v. Arizona Board of Regents
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Raner C Collins |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00028 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 21, 2018 1:34 AM MST |
Defendant
Arizona Board of Regents
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia MacCorquodale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janice Cervelli
|
Represented By
|
1. | Second former dean joins lawsuit against University of Arizona over gender pay gap (azcentral.com) |
Submitted Thu 03/08/2018 | |
2. | Ex-University of Arizona professor files $2M gender discrimination lawsuit against Arizona Board of Regents (tucson.com) |
Submitted Tue 01/23/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
48 | 48
order
Judgment
Thu 07/25 11:57 AM
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, pursuant to the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 7/25/2019. (MCO) |
|
47 | 47
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 07/25 11:53 AM
ORDER pursuant to46 Stipulation of Dismiss with Prejudice: IT IS ORDERED the above-captioned action is DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 7/25/2019. (MCO) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
46 | 46
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 07/24 9:36 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Patricia MacCorquodale.(Melzer, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
45 | 45
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 07/24 9:30 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Patricia MacCorquodale. (Melzer, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 04/10 1:40 PM
ORDER granting43 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. All remaining discovery deadlines set by the Court in its August 30, 2018, Case Management Order (Doc. 17) are extended as follows: The deadline for Rebuttal Expert Disclosures is extended to July 1, 2019; The deadline for completion of all Fact Discovery is extended to July 30, 2019; The deadline for Dispositive Motions is extended to August 28, 2019; In addition, the parties shall file a proposed Joint Pretrial Order on or before September 28, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 4/10/2019. (MCO) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 04/08 6:25 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Patricia MacCorquodale.(Melzer, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
notice
Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses
Thu 03/28 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Arizona Board of Regents. (Ryden, Monica) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
notice
Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses
Fri 03/22 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Arizona Board of Regents. (Ryden, Monica) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Thu 03/21 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Patricia MacCorquodale. (Melzer, Andrew) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Deposition
Mon 03/18 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Marilyn Taylor, filed by Patricia MacCorquodale. (Melzer, Andrew) |
|
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Deposition
Mon 03/18 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Elliott Cheu, filed by Patricia MacCorquodale. (Melzer, Andrew) |
|
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Deposition
Mon 03/18 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Andrew Comrie, filed by Patricia MacCorquodale. (Melzer, Andrew) |
|
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Deposition
Mon 03/18 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Allison Vaillancourt, filed by Patricia MacCorquodale. (Melzer, Andrew) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses
Fri 03/15 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Arizona Board of Regents. (Ryden, Monica) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Fri 03/15 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Monica Marie Ryden on behalf of Arizona Board of Regents. (Ryden, Monica) |
|
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions
Mon 02/04 6:41 PM
REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions by Patricia MacCorquodale. (Melzer, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses
Tue 01/29 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) First, Second and Third Supplements filed by Defendant Arizona Board of Regents. (Jones, Robert) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Deposition
Fri 12/21 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Patricia MacCorquodale, filed by Arizona Board of Regents. (Boun, Sonya) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Deposition
Fri 12/21 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Janice Cervelli, filed by Arizona Board of Regents. (Boun, Sonya) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 12/12 11:22 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Janice Cervelli, Patricia MacCorquodale. (Melzer, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)
Thu 11/29 1:54 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by David W Sanford. (Sanford, David) |
|
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)
Wed 11/21 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal James E. Richardson filed by Andrew C Melzer. (Melzer, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 11/14 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Janice Cervelli, Patricia MacCorquodale. (Melzer, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 11/07 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Arizona Board of Regents. (Boun, Sonya) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 11/07 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Arizona Board of Regents. (Boun, Sonya) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Wed 10/31 1:41 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Protective Order as stipulated by the parties. Signed by Judge Raner C Collins on 10/31/2018 (MCO) |
|
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Protective Order
Tue 10/30 3:22 PM
MOTION for Protective Order [Stipulated by the Parties] by Arizona Board of Regents.(Jones, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order | ||
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 10/26 4:10 PM
ORDERED that the motion is granted in part. The subpoenas shall be stayed until the emergency motion is fully briefed and the Court fully rules on the emergency motion. Signed by Judge Raner C Collins on 10/26/2018. (MCO) |
|
20 | 20
16
pgs
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 10/26 2:59 PM
Emergency MOTION For the Court to Order St. Mary's College and Clemson University to Refrain from Responding to Subpoenas Duces Tecum Until Further Orders from this Court by Janice Cervelli.(Melzer, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 10/15 12:38 PM
NOTICE re: Notice of Intent to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas by Arizona Board of Regents . (Boun, Sonya) |
|
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only)
Mon 10/01 11:59 AM
*NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Robert Kendall Jones. (Jones, Robert) *Modified to remove attorney on 10/1/2018 (MCO) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 08/30 3:55 PM
ORDER: The Court enters the following Case Management Order to govern the litigation in this case. Discovery due by 5/30/2019. Dispositive motions due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 8/29/2018. (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.)(BAR) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 08/17 5:59 PM
NOTICE re: Third Notice of Filing of Consent to Sue Form by Janice Cervelli, Patricia MacCorquodale .(Richardson, James) |
|
Att: 1 Consent to Join Collective Action and Become a Party Plaintiff | ||
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Reset Cal Conflict - Hearing
Mon 08/13 11:30 AM
Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED the Scheduling Conference, presently set for August 14, 2018 at 11:00am is VACATED and RESET. The Scheduling Conference is now set for 8/29/2018 at 11:00 AM before Chief Judge Raner C Collins. Ordered by Chief Judge Raner C Collins. (RCC, cl)( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP
Mon 08/06 6:24 PM
Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiffs Janice Cervelli, Patricia MacCorquodale. (Richardson, James) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
Wed 07/25 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Arizona Board of Regents. (Boun, Sonya) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
Mon 07/16 8:56 PM
NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiffs Janice Cervelli, Patricia MacCorquodale. (Richardson, James) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 07/06 10:10 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Telephone Conference set for 8/14/2018 at 11:00 AM. The Court will initiate the teleconference with the parties' respective counsel. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall email their preferred telephonic contact information to the Court's law clerk, on or before August 5, 2018. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 10 days before the Case Management Conference. (See ORDER for additional details) Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 7/5/2018.(MCO) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 06/14 11:18 AM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint by Arizona Board of Regents.(Boun, Sonya) |
|
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
misc
Remark (Public)
Tue 05/15 4:19 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Victoria Woodin Chavey on behalf of Arizona Board of Regents. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service Executed
Mon 05/07 2:29 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Janice Cervelli, Patricia MacCorquodale: Affidavit of Service re: First Amended Collective Action Complaint; Summons in a Civil Action; Proof of Service; Notice of Availability of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction; Second Notice of Filing of Consent to Sue Forms; Consent to Join Collective Action and Become Party Plaintiff (Janice Cervelli); Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project; General Order 17-08; Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project Checklist; Consent to Join Collective Action and Become Party Plaintiff (Patricia MacCorquodale) upon Arizona Board of Regents on April 17, 2018. (Richardson, James) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/08 9:11 AM
Summons Issued as to Arizona Board of Regents. (KAH) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Submitted
Wed 03/07 12:45 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Janice Cervelli, Patricia MacCorquodale. (Richardson, James) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 03/07 12:42 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arizona Board of Regents filed by Patricia MacCorquodale, Janice Cervelli.(Richardson, James) |
|
Att: 1 Second Notice of Filing of Consent to Sue Form, | ||
Att: 2 Consent to Join Collective Action and Become Party Plaintiff | ||
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
misc
Remark (Public)
Mon 02/05 8:21 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Andrew C Melzer on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
misc
Remark (Public)
Fri 02/02 4:26 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for James E Richardson on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
misc
Remark (Public)
Fri 02/02 4:31 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for David W Sanford on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/22 3:54 PM
Summons Issued as to Arizona Board of Regents. (MCO) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)
Mon 01/22 3:50 PM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) |
|
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Mon 01/22 3:50 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15079088. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Raner C Collins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 4:CV-18-28-TUC-RCC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Mon 01/22 3:48 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Patricia MacCorquodale. (Turchik, Merle) (MCO) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/22 3:46 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15079088 filed by Patricia MacCorquodale. (Turchik, Merle)(MCO) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION AND BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF, | ||
Att: 3 FIRST NOTICE OF FILING OF CONSENT TO SUE FORMS |