Montes v. Dole Food International et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David C Bury |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00029 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 21, 2018 1:35 AM MST |
Defendant
CNA Financial
|
|
Defendant
CNA/CNA ClaimPlus Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Continental Casualty Company
|
|
Defendant
Dole Food Company Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Dole Food International
|
|
Defendant
Stacy Elliott
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan McSparran
|
|
Defendant
David H Murdock
|
|
Defendant
Dino E Robusto
|
|
Defendant
Jack Stutz
|
|
Plaintiff
Steven Montes
5401 E 30th Street
Tucson, AZ 85711 |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Clerks Judgment
Wed 03/14 11:17 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed January 25, 2018, judgment is entered in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing, and complaint and action are dismissed for failure to comply with the Court's order. (SIB) |
|
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
Wed 03/14 10:52 AM
ORDER that the Motions to Reconsider and for additional time (Doc.10 ) are both denied. Plaintiff failed to follow Court orders and untimely filed a response to the Court's screening order of January 25, 2018. This action is dismissed and closed as of February 27, 2018. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 3/14/2018. (SIB) |
|
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Reconsideration Extension of Time to Amend
Tue 03/06 2:55 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration and Request for Additional Time by Steven Montes. (3 pages) (SIB) (Additional attachment(s) #1 Exhibits) (SIB) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 01/25 10:43 AM
ORDER that the motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc.2 ) is GRANTED and the Complaint and this action are dismissed without prejudice to refiling a First Amended Complaint on or before February 23, 2018. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 1/24/2018. (SIB) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Notice to Self-Represented Litigant
Mon 01/22 3:15 PM
NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (DLC) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)
Mon 01/22 3:14 PM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Mon 01/22 3:13 PM
Notice to the District of Columbia advising of receipt of 1:17-cv-02266 case transferred. (DLC) |
|
5 | 5
misc
New Case Opened
Mon 01/22 2:51 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David C Bury. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 4:CV 18-00029 TUC-DCB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 01/22 2:18 PM
CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:17-cv-02266 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received |
|
Case transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona, pursuant to Court Order entered 12/21/2018. Sent to Court Electronically. (md) [Transferred from dcd on 1/22/2018.] | ||
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the District of Arizona. Determination of whether plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without pre-payment of fees to be decided by the Transferee Court. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/21/2017. (md) [Transferred from dcd on 1/22/2018.] | |
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by STEVEN MONTES. (md) [Transferred from dcd on 1/22/2018.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against CNA /CNA CLAIMPLUS INCORPORATED, CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, DOLE FOOD COMPANY INCORPORATED, DOLE FOOD INTERNATIONAL, STACY ELLIOTT, JONATHAN MCSPARRAN, DAVID H. MURDOCK, DINO E. ROBUSTO, JACK STUTZ filed by STEVEN MONTES. (md) [Transferred from dcd on 1/22/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to 26, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 27 to 36, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 37 Part 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 37 Part 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 37 Part 3 | ||
Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/26/2017. (md) [Transferred from dcd on 1/22/2018.] |