Adrian Falkner v. General Motors Company et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00549 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 21, 2018 2:41 AM PDT |
Defendant
General Motors Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
General Motors LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adrian Falkner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
49 | 49
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Thu 02/28 9:12 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (mrgo) |
|
Att: 1 Dismissal | ||
48 | 48
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 02/27 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Adrian Falkner. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Erikson, David) |
|
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
47 | 47
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 11/19 10:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS MOVING CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR PENDING SETTLEMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: Notice of Settlement46 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) |
|
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
46 | 46
notice
Settlement
Fri 11/16 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Adrian Falkner. (Waller, Antoinette) |
|
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Wed 09/26 10:27 AM
CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Jury Trial is set for 2/26/2019 at 9:00 AM, with a Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2019 at 3:00 PM. (pc) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
17
pgs
order
Summary Judgment
Tue 09/18 9:14 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT30 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. For the foregoing reasons, the Court DENIES Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment on the copyright infringement claim and GRANTS Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment on the DMCA claim. The court also GRANTS Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment to preclude the availability of punitive damages. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
transcript
Transcript Order Form (G-120)
Wed 08/29 9:54 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter. Hrng Date: 8-27-18. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (ha) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
minutes
Motion Hearing Summary Judgment
Tue 08/28 1:58 PM
MINUTES OF30 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Hearing held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The motion is submitted. Order to issue. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (mrgo) |
|
41 | 41
transcript
Transcript Order Form (G-120)
Mon 08/27 4:09 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter. Hrng Date: 8/27/18 Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (ha) |
|
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Errata
Tue 08/21 5:42 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. correcting Reply (Motion related)39 (Petrich, Louis) |
|
Att: 1 Defendant's Request to File Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply re Defendant General Motors LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
39 | 39
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Tue 08/21 5:22 PM
REPLY In Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 30 filed by Defendant General Motors LLC.(Petrich, Louis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Fri 08/17 2:32 PM
REPLY in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 30 sur-reply filed by Plaintiff Adrian Falkner. (Erikson, David) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 08/03 10:11 AM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: Request to file sur-reply filed by Plaintiff35 - The Court, having read the request and the opposition36 , GRANTS the request to file a sur-reply. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Mon 07/30 4:01 PM
Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Leave to File Surreply re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 30 filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Petrich, Louis) |
|
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Fri 07/27 4:54 PM
Request to file sur-reply filed by Plaintiff Adrian Falkner re: Response in Support of Motion,,,33 (Erikson, David) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 07/20 8:46 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint30 - The motion hearing previously scheduled for 7/23/2018 at 1:30 PM has been rescheduled to 8/27/2018 at 01:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Mon 07/09 3:39 PM
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 30 filed by Defendant General Motors LLC.(Petrich, Louis) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Louis Petrich Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Louis Petrich Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Alex Bernstein Supplemental Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit G to Alex Bernstein Supplemental Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit G-1 To Alex Bernstein Supplemental Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration Second Declaration of Donny Nordlicht, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G to Second Declaration of Donny Nordlicht, | ||
Att: 8 Declaration Second Declaration of Paul Margolis, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit A to Second Declaration of Paul Margolis, | ||
Att: 10 Supplement Defendant GM's Response to Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections, | ||
Att: 11 Supplement Defendant GM's Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Genuine Issues | ||
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 07/02 5:13 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 30 filed by Plaintiff Adrian Falkner.(Erikson, David) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Statement of Genuine Issues in Opposition to MSJ, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Adrian Falkner ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to MSJ, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration Declaration of S. Ryan Patterson ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to MSJ | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 07/02 11:10 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney S Ryan Patterson counsel for Plaintiff Adrian Falkner. Adding S. Ryan Patterson as counsel of record for Adrian Falkner for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Adrian Falkner. (Attorney S Ryan Patterson added to party Adrian Falkner(pty:pla))(Patterson, S) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 06/25 4:55 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/23/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Petrich, Louis) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Alex Bernstein, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-F, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Paul Margolis, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A-D, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration of Donny Nordlicht, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit A-B, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Judgment in Favor of General Motors LLC | ||
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Tue 05/15 2:16 PM
MINUTES OF NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court sets the following schedule: Motions for Summary Judgment due by 6/25/2018. Responses due by 7/2/2018, Replies due by 7/9/2018. Hearing set for 7/23/2018, at 1:30 p.m. Court Reporter: N/A. (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Substitute Attorney
Wed 04/11 12:40 PM
ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting26 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Louis P. Petrich is substituted in place of David Hosp; Garrett K Sakimae; John C Adkisson and Elizabeth Brenckman for defendant. Attorney R David Hosp; Garrett K Sakimae; John C Adkisson and Elizabeth Brenckman terminated. (mrgo) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 04/10 11:23 AM
NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants General Motors Company, General Motors LLC, identifying Adrian Falkner, General Motors LLC, General Motors Holdings LLC, General Motors Company, and Axis Professional Insurance. (Petrich, Louis) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Substitute Attorney (G-01)
Tue 04/10 11:20 AM
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Louis P. Petrich in place of attorney Garrett Sakimae filed by Defendants General Motors Company, General Motors LLC. (Attorney Louis P Petrich added to party General Motors Company(pty:dft), Attorney Louis P Petrich added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft)) (Petrich, Louis) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order On Request For Approval Of Substitution Or Withdrawal Of Attorney | ||
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 04/05 10:22 AM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 5/14/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 04/04 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant General Motors LLC, identifying General Motors Holdings LLC and General Motors Company. (Brenckman, Elizabeth) |
|
23 | 23
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 04/04 10:40 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition22 and Defenses filed by Defendant General Motors LLC.(Attorney Elizabeth Brenckman added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft))(Brenckman, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Wed 03/21 3:43 PM
Corrected First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, General Motors LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Amended Complaint/Petition,19 , filed by plaintiff Adrian Falkner(Erikson, David) |
|
21 | 21
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Wed 03/21 2:59 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: First Amended Complaint/Petition19 by Clerk of Court. The document is stricken. Counsel are directed to file a corrected first amended complaint. (mrgo) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 03/21 2:57 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint/Petition19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s): The named defendant in the caption doesn't match the name in the body of complaint. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) |
|
19 | 19
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Wed 03/21 11:53 AM
[DOCUMENT IS ORDERED STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 21] FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, General Motors LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by plaintiff Adrian Falkner(Erikson, David) Modified on 3/21/2018 (mrgo) |
|
18 | 18
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/21 11:14 AM
ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting17 Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth E. Brenckman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant General Motors Company, designating Garrett K. Sakimae as local counsel. (mrgo) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 03/20 8:49 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth E. Brenckman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21438762) filed by Defendant General Motors Company. (Attachments : #1 Proposed Order) (Sakimae, Garrett) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Thu 03/15 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John C. Adkisson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21409833)13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lom) |
|
15 | 15
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 03/14 4:18 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to General Motors Company answer now due 3/21/2018, filed by defendant General Motors Company.(Sakimae, Garrett) |
|
14 | 14
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/14 2:51 PM
ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting13 Non-Resident Attorney John C. Adkisson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant General Motors Company, designating Garrett K. Sakimae as local counsel. (mrgo) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 03/14 11:56 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John C. Adkisson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21409833) filed by Defendant General Motors Company. (Sakimae, Garrett) |
|
12 | 12
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/14 10:25 AM
ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting11 Non-Resident Attorney R. David Hosp APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant General Motors Company, designating Garrett K. Sakimae as local counsel. (mrgo) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 03/13 8:41 AM
Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney R. David Hosp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 3/12/2018, Receipt No. 268CC1F8) filed by Defendant General Motors Company. (Sakimae, Garrett) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 03/12 6:13 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney R. David Hosp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21398445) filed by Defendant General Motors Company. (Attorney Garrett K Sakimae added to party General Motors Company(pty:dft)) (Sakimae, Garrett) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order granting Application for PHV - Hosp | ||
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 01/24 11:06 AM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 01/23 8:31 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant General Motors Company. (et) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 01/23 8:30 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 01/23 8:30 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Mon 01/22 4:51 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Adrian Falkner. (Erikson, David) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Mon 01/22 4:49 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Adrian Falkner. (Erikson, David) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 01/22 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Adrian Falkner, (Erikson, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 01/22 4:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Adrian Falkner. (Erikson, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 01/22 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21137872 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Adrian Falkner. (Attorney David A Erikson added to party Adrian Falkner(pty:pla))(Erikson, David) |