Nilsson v. General Motors LLC
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey S White |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00471 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 21, 2018 3:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
General Motors LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oscar Willhelm Nilsson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 06/26 10:26 AM
ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 33 Stipulation FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 06/25 10:00 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by General Motors LLC. (Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/30 12:16 PM
NOTICE by General Motors LLC Joint Notice of Settlement (Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 05/21 9:00 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Wed 04/04 9:09 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 4/4/2018) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 04/03 3:50 PM
Order by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 26 Stipulation Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018) |
|
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation selecting Private ADR
Tue 04/03 3:47 PM
Order by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 25 Stipulation selecting Private ADR.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018) |
|
27 | 27
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Tue 04/03 3:15 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kent, Trinette) (Filed on 4/3/2018) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 04/03 9:09 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Order Continuing Initial Case Management Conference filed by General Motors LLC.(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 4/3/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration | ||
25 | 25
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR
Tue 04/03 8:57 AM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by General Motors LLC filed by General Motors LLC. (Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 4/3/2018) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/02 11:47 AM
Order by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Darin J. Lang.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Mon 04/02 10:26 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings, LLC for General Motors LLC. (Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 4/2/2018) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Mon 04/02 10:25 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings, LLC for General Motors LLC. (Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 4/2/2018) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Mon 04/02 9:33 AM
Electronic filing error. The Names: General Motors Holdings LLC and General Motors Company were not entered. [err102] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety Re:20 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by General Motors LLC,19 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by General Motors LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018) |
||
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/30 11:40 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12234385.) filed by General Motors LLC. (Lang, Darin) (Filed on 3/30/2018) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 03/30 9:30 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors LLC for General Motors LLC. (Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 3/30/2018) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 03/30 9:29 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors LLC for General Motors LLC. (Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 3/30/2018) |
|
18 | 18
7
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/30 9:26 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGeneral Motors LLC. (Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 3/30/2018) |
|
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 03/21 10:49 AM
ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 16 Stipulation Regarding Further Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint; AND INSTURCTIONS TO PARTIES. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 03/20 12:01 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Further Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by General Motors LLC.(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 3/20/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 02/21 8:14 AM
ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 14 Stipulation Excluding Time Under STA From February 20, 2018, Through March 13, 2018. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2018) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 02/20 2:00 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by General Motors LLC.(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 2/20/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/08 7:21 AM
ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Sergei Lemberg. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/07 1:59 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12092474.) filed by Oscar Willhelm Nilsson.(Lemberg, Sergei) (Filed on 2/7/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 02/06 10:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oscar Willhelm Nilsson. General Motors LLC served on 2/1/2018, answer due 2/22/2018. (Kent, Trinette) (Filed on 2/6/2018) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 01/29 12:49 PM
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/29/18. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 01/26 10:41 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/26/2018.(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
8 | 8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Fri 01/26 8:44 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/25 11:32 AM
DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Oscar Willhelm Nilsson.. (Kent, Trinette) (Filed on 1/25/2018) Modified on 1/25/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 01/23 11:34 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2018 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/23 11:32 AM
Summons Issued as to General Motors LLC. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 01/23 7:38 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/6/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Oscar Willhelm Nilsson . (Kent, Trinette) (Filed on 1/22/2018) | |
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Kent, Trinette) (Filed on 1/22/2018) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against General Motors LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12043094.). Filed byOscar Willhelm Nilsson.(Kent, Trinette) (Filed on 1/22/2018) Modified on 1/23/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] The civil cover sheet filed is outdated. You may find the current civil cover sheet at www.cans.uscourts.gov. Please re-file the current civil cover sheet in its entirety. Re:[1-1] Civil cover sheet filed by Oscar Willhelm Nilsson (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018) |