California Northern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Scott Corley
Case #: 3:18-cv-00535
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2018
Terminated:Nov 01, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 24, 2018 2:05 AM PDT
Amicus
The Women's and Children's Advocacy Project, Equal Means Equal, National Coalition Against Violent Athletes, Faculty Against Rape, Allies Reaching for Equality, Women Matter, We Are Woman
Represented By
Jeffrey L. Fillerup
Rincon Law LLP
contact info
Wendy Murphy
New England Law|boston
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Department of Education
Represented By
Benjamin Thomas Takemoto
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Steven Andrew Myers
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Elisabeth DeVos
Represented By
Benjamin Thomas Takemoto
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Steven Andrew Myers
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Candice Jackson
Represented By
Benjamin Thomas Takemoto
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Steven Andrew Myers
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
SurvJustice Inc
Represented By
Jennifer Abby Reisch
Equal Rights Advocates
contact info
Karianne M. Jones
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Robin Frances Thurston
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Leecia Jo Welch
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Alice Abrokwa
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Emily Martin
contact info
Alexandra Brodsky
contact info
Neena Chaudhry
contact info
Javier M. Guzman
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Skye L. Perryman
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Sunu Chandy
contact info
Plaintiff
Equal Rights Advocates
Represented By
Jennifer Abby Reisch
Equal Rights Advocates
contact info
Karianne M. Jones
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Robin Frances Thurston
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Leecia Jo Welch
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Alice Abrokwa
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Emily Martin
contact info
Alexandra Brodsky
contact info
Neena Chaudhry
contact info
Javier M. Guzman
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Skye L. Perryman
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Sunu Chandy
contact info
Plaintiff
Victim Rights Law Center
Represented By
Jennifer Abby Reisch
Equal Rights Advocates
contact info
Karianne M. Jones
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Robin Frances Thurston
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Leecia Jo Welch
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Alice Abrokwa
National Center For Youth Law
contact info
Emily Martin
contact info
Alexandra Brodsky
contact info
Neena Chaudhry
contact info
Javier M. Guzman
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Skye L. Perryman
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Sunu Chandy
contact info

GPO Oct 01 2018
8)Order, signed 10/1/18, by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 40 Motion to Dismiss; granting 40 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.( Amended Complaint, if any, due by 11/1/2018.).(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/201
Docket last updated: 11/15/2019 11:59 PM PST
Friday, November 01, 2019
150 150 order Judgment Fri 2:38 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/1/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
149 149 25 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Fri 2:36 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 136 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 140 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
148 148 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Benjamin Thomas Takemoto (Takemoto, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2019
147 147 misc Transcript Mon 5:49 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on October 17, 2019, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Redaction Request due 11/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2020. (Columbini, Joan)
Related: [-] 146 Transcript Order, (s)146