EXCO Operating Company, LP et al v. Shell Energy North America (US), L.P. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-30155
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-30155
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:18-ap-03015 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 08, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Shell Energy North America (US), L.P.
1000 Main 12th Floor
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
BG US Production Company, LLC
5444 Westheimer Suite 1200
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EXCO Operating Company, LP
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EXCO Resources, Inc.
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raider Marketing, LP
12377 Merit Drive Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/28/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 04/08 1:33 PM
Adversary Case 4:18-ap-3015 Closed. (rcas) |
||
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 04/18 11:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 04/18/2018. (Admin.) |
|
34 | 34
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 04/18 11:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 04/18/2018. (Admin.) |
|
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 04/18 11:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 04/18/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 04/16 3:18 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Michael B. Slade added for EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Resources, Inc., Raider Marketing, LP. Signed on 4/16/2018. (hcar) |
|
31 | 31
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 04/16 3:12 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice |
|
30 | 30
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 04/16 3:06 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice |
|
Sunday, April 15, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Affidavit
Sun 04/15 1:32 PM
Affidavit Re: Affidavit of Service of Forrest Kuffer of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC Relating to the Notice of Filing of Revised Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice (Filed By Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC ) (Garabato, Sid) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 04/06 11:58 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 04/06/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (Form)
Wed 04/04 11:48 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to26 Transcript. Parties notified (hcar) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
45
pgs
court
Transcript
Tue 04/03 12:32 PM
Transcript RE: Motion Hearing held on March 29, 2018 before Judge Marvin Isgur. Transcript is available for viewing in the Clerk's Office. Filed by Transcript access will be restricted through 07/2/2018. (mhen) |
|
Saturday, March 31, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 03/31 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 03/31/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Thu 03/29 2:52 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case 4:18-ap-3015 Signed on 3/29/2018. Related Document14 . (mrios) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Affidavit
Thu 03/29 1:55 PM
Affidavit Re: Affidavit of Service of Forrest Kuffer of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC Regarding the Debtors' Witness and Exhibit List for March 29, 2018 Hearing (Filed By Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC ) (Garabato, Sid) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice
Thu 03/29 10:52 AM
Notice of Filing of Revised Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Emergency Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice . Filed by EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Resources, Inc., Raider Marketing, LP(Greco, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Redline | ||
court
Courtroom Minutes (Text)
Sat 03/31 11:07 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Hearing Held: 1:30 PM. Appearances: Michael Slade, Christopher Greco and Alexandra Schwarzman for the Debtors. Robin Russell, Joe Buoni, Ashley Harper for Enterprise Products Operating LLC and Acadian Gas Pipeline System. Paul Mitchell, Nicholas Zugaro and John Deis for Enterprise Products and Acadian Gas Pipeline System. Patti Tomasco, Matthew Cavenaugh and Robert Stark for Unsecured Creditors Committee. Mark Sherrill for Shell BG NAESB. Tim McConn, Reagan Simpson and Steven Messer for Bluescape Resources Company LLC. Geoffrey Bracken for EXCO and Raider Marketing. Ms. Schwarzman announced Shell would not be moving forward with the Motion to Compel (ECF#9) on Adversary 18-03015 The Motion to Dismiss Adversary 18-03015 was Granted. Order Dismissing Adversary without prejudice signed. (mrios) |
||
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 03/28 9:56 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Michael B. Slade . Filed by EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Resources, Inc., Raider Marketing, LP (Greco, Christopher) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 03/28 9:54 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Alexandra Schwarzman . Filed by EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Resources, Inc., Raider Marketing, LP (Greco, Christopher) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 03/28 9:53 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Christopher T. Greco . Filed by EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Resources, Inc., Raider Marketing, LP (Greco, Christopher) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Affidavit
Wed 03/28 7:41 PM
Affidavit Re: Affidavit of Service of Catherine Henriquez Regarding Plaintiffs Emergency Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice, (Filed By Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC ) (Garabato, Sid) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Witness List
Tue 03/27 3:27 PM
Witness List (Filed By BG US Production Company, LLC, Shell Energy North America (US), L.P. ). (Sherrill, Mark) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Exhibit List
Tue 03/27 1:14 PM
Exhibit List, Witness List (Filed By EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Resources, Inc., Raider Marketing, LP ). (Greco, Christopher) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 03/23 4:27 PM
First Amended Complaint (Bracken, Geoffrey) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Emergency Motion
Fri 03/23 4:15 PM
Emergency Motion / Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice Filed by EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Resources, Inc., Raider Marketing, LP Hearing scheduled for 3/29/2018 at 01:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (Greco, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan(for Attorney)
Thu 03/22 6:22 PM
Joint Discovery Plan/Case Management Plan (Filed By EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Resources, Inc., Raider Marketing, LP ). (Bracken, Geoffrey) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Initial Disclosure Rule 26
Thu 03/22 5:15 PM
Initial Disclosure Rule 26 (Filed By EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Resources, Inc., Raider Marketing, LP ). (Bracken, Geoffrey) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/02 6:57 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by BG US Production Company, LLC, Shell Energy North America (US), L.P. (Sherrill, Mark) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice
Fri 03/02 6:53 PM
Notice of Hearing . Filed by BG US Production Company, LLC, Shell Energy North America (US), L.P. (Sherrill, Mark) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Generic Motion (Adversary)
Fri 03/02 6:49 PM
Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation Filed by BG US Production Company, LLC, Shell Energy North America (US), L.P. Hearing scheduled for 3/29/2018 at 01:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (Sherrill, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - BG NAESB | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Transaction Confirmation | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Adequate Assurance of Performance Letter | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - EXCO Response dated 012617 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Termination Notice | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Original Petition | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - EXCO Response 012717 | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Amended Petition | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I - JDA | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J - TGGT | ||
Att: 11 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel | ||
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 02/21 11:10 AM
Summons Service Executed on Shell Energy North America (US), L.P. 1/31/2018. (Bracken, Geoffrey) |
|
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 02/21 11:09 AM
Summons Service Executed on BG US Production Company, LLC 1/31/2018. (Bracken, Geoffrey) |
|
Sunday, February 18, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 02/18 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 02/18/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 02/16 1:22 PM
Scheduling Order Signed on 2/16/2018 Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2018 at 01:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (adol) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Wed 01/31 7:16 AM
Summons Issued on BG US Production Company, LLC Date Issued 1/31/2018; Shell Energy North America (US), L.P. Date Issued 1/31/2018. (mmap) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Fri 01/26 12:59 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on BG US Production Company, LLC. (Filed By EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Resources, Inc., Raider Marketing, LP ). (Bracken, Geoffrey) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Fri 01/26 12:58 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Shell Energy North America (US), L.P. (Filed By EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Resources, Inc., Raider Marketing, LP ). (Bracken, Geoffrey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Fri 01/26 12:52 PM
Adversary case 18-03015 Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by EXCO Operating Company, LP, EXCO Resources, Inc., Raider Marketing, LP against Shell Energy North America (US), L.P., BG US Production Company, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Bracken, Geoffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet |